Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Referred: Christopher C Bly
Case #: 1:24-cv-04936
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (religion)
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Ollie Clemsons
Represented By
Anna C. Perry
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
John Douglas Bennett
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Orrin Scott Hamilton
Represented By
Anna C. Perry
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
John Douglas Bennett
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shametta Jones-Harrell
Represented By
Anna C. Perry
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
John Douglas Bennett
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The City of Austell Georgia
Represented By
Anna C. Perry
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
John Douglas Bennett
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The City of Austell Georgia Police Department
Represented By
Anna C. Perry
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
John Douglas Bennett
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Edward Roberts
137 Roseberry Lane Apt 2422
Columbia, SC 29223


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/31 3:09 PM
NOTICE by Ollie Clemsons, Orrin Scott Hamilton, Shametta Jones-Harrell, The City of Austell Georgia, The City of Austell Georgia Police Department Withdrawal as Attorney (Daughdril, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/29 12:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by The City of Austell Georgia, The City of Austell Georgia Police Department, Orrin Scott Hamilton, Shametta Jones-Harrell, Ollie Clemsons. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/29 3:45 PM
Submission of20 MOTION for More Definite Statement, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jtj)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/21 10:56 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Jason Edward Roberts. (cpp)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/17 4:37 PM
NOTICE by The City of Austell Georgia, The City of Austell Georgia Police Department, Orrin Scott Hamilton, Shametta Jones-Harrell, Ollie Clemsons of Withdrawal of Counsel (Perry, Anna)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/13 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten Searle Daughdril on behalf of The City of Austell Georgia, The City of Austell Georgia Police Department, Orrin Scott Hamilton, Shametta Jones-Harrell, Ollie Clemsons (Daughdril, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
20 20 motion More Definite Statement Thu 01/09 4:30 PM
MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by The City of Austell Georgia, The City of Austell Georgia Police Department, Orrin Scott Hamilton, Shametta Jones-Harrell, Ollie Clemsons.(Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Amend Wed 12/18 10:32 AM
ORDER denying as moot8 Plaintiff's motion to withdraw his amended complaint17 and motion for leave to amend18 . The operative pleading in this case is Plaintiff's amended complaint found at Docket Entry 11. Additionally, in light of the upcoming holidays, the Court sua sponte EXTENDS Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint through January 10, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/17/2024. (djs)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
18 18 motion Amend Mon 12/16 8:25 AM
MOTION to Amend Complaint11 by Jason Edward Roberts. (djs)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/16 8:23 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Amended Complaint11 by Jason Edward Roberts. (djs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 service Return of Service Executed Tue 12/10 12:24 PM
Return of Service Executed by Jason Edward Roberts. The City of Austell Georgia Police Department served on 11/5/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (djs)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Return of Service Executed Tue 12/10 12:23 PM
Return of Service Executed by Jason Edward Roberts. The City of Austell Georgia served on 11/5/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (djs)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Return of Service Executed Tue 12/10 12:22 PM
Return of Service Executed by Jason Edward Roberts. Shametta Jones-Harrell served on 11/5/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (djs)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Return of Service Executed Tue 12/10 12:21 PM
Return of Service Executed by Jason Edward Roberts. Ollie Clemsons served on 11/5/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (djs)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Return of Service Executed Tue 12/10 12:21 PM
Return of Service Executed by Jason Edward Roberts. Orrin Scott Hamilton served on 11/5/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (djs)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/10 11:40 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ollie Clemsons, Orrin Scott Hamilton, Shametta Jones-Harrell, The City of Austell Georgia, The City of Austell Georgia Police Department with Jury Demand filed by Jason Edward Roberts.(djs)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/10 11:37 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Partially) filed by Jason Edward Roberts. (djs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/26 10:57 AM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by The City of Austell Georgia, The City of Austell Georgia Police Department, Orrin Scott Hamilton, Shametta Jones-Harrell, Ollie Clemsons. Discovery ends on 4/25/2025.(Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 11/25 2:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Partially) with Brief In Support by The City of Austell Georgia, The City of Austell Georgia Police Department, Orrin Scott Hamilton, Shametta Jones-Harrell, Ollie Clemsons. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/07 3:41 PM
ORDER declining assignment of case. Case reassigned to Judge Leigh Martin May for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-4936-LMM-CCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/7/24. (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/07 3:44 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Edward Roberts re7 Order Reassigning Case. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 2:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Shametta Jones-Harrell. (dob)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 2:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Ollie Clemsons. (dob)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 2:57 PM
Summons Issued as to The City of Austell Georgia. (dob)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to The City of Austell Georgia Police Department. (dob)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Orrin Scott Hamilton. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jason Edward Roberts (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100015105) (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet