Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Case #: 1:24-cv-04968
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Terminated:Nov 01, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Fairway Independant Mortgage Corporation
Defendant
McCalla Raymer, Leibert Pierce LLC
Defendant
Chris Shumate
Defendant
Briana Tookes
Plaintiff
James Bussey
455 Liberty Trace
Roswell, GA 30076
Plaintiff
Brenda Sandoval Rey
455 Liberty Trace
Roswell, GA 30076


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/25 10:36 AM
MOTION to Demand CUSIP Numbers for Court Held Bonds by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey. (jbu)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/25 10:35 AM
MOTION to Demand CUSIP Numbers for Court Held Bonds by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey. (jbu)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Filing Fri 04/25 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Filing Objection and Notice of Judicial Misconduct by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey re14 Order.(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Thursday, April 10, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge Thu 04/10 10:35 AM
ORDER denying as moot11 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Plaintiffs are again CAUTIONED that continuing to file papers in this closed case may result in filing restrictions going forward. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 4/10/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/10 10:36 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey re14 Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 2 pgs misc Order from Other Court Wed 03/19 3:13 PM
ORDER of USCA- 11th Circuit re: On Petition for Writ of Prohibition: Motion to reinstate appeal filed by Petitioners James Bussey and Brenda Sandoval Rey is GRANTED by clerk. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
12 12 2 pgs misc Order from Other Court Tue 03/04 4:23 PM
ORDER of USCA- 11th Circuit re: On Petition for Writ of Prohibition: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellants James Bussey and Brenda Sandoval Rey failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements within the time fixed by the rules and because the appellants James Bussey and Brenda Sandoval Rey failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Service within the time fixed by the rules. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 02/05 2:07 PM
Submission of11 MOTION to Disqualify Judge, to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 motion Disqualify Judge Tue 01/28 12:27 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Judge by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/27 4:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fairway Independant Mortgage Corporation, McCalla Raymer, Leibert Pierce LLC, Chris Shumate, Briana Tookes, Rosemary Metz filed by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey.(djs)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/27 4:44 PM
MOTION for Status Report by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey. (djs)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 motion Disqualify Attorney Mon 11/25 3:04 PM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR MOTION to Disqualify Attorney and Law Firm by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey. (jbu) Modified on 11/25/2024 - refiled in main case (jbu)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Tue 11/05 8:41 AM
Return of Service Executed by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey. Fairway Independant Mortgage Corporation served on 11/1/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (jbu)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Tue 11/05 8:41 AM
Return of Service Executed by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey. McCalla Raymer, Leibert Pierce LLC served on 11/1/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
5 5 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for TRO Fri 11/01 3:17 PM
ORDER: The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction in 1:24-cv-03329-VMC 14 is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction in case number 1:24-cv-04968-VMC2 is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Civil Action No. 1:24-cv-04968-VMC is CONSOLIDATED into Civil Action No. 1:24-cv-03329-VMC. The Clerk is DIRECTED to (1) file this Order in Civil Action No. 1:24-cv-04968-VMC; and (2) CLOSE Civil Action No. 1:24-cv-04968. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 11/1/2024. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 11/01 3:19 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/01 3:21 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey re5 Order (jbu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to McCalla Raymer, Leibert Pierce LLC. (jbu)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/30 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Fairway Independant Mortgage Corporation. (jbu)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Wed 10/30 2:55 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey. (jbu)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT filed by James Bussey, Brenda Sandoval Rey. (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100015136)(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 10/30 2:57 PM
Submission of2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (jbu)
Related: [-]