Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Everett
Case #: 3:24-bk-33420
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Dec 04, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025

Debtor
Pennington Construction, Inc.
PO Box 687
Winnsboro, TX 75494-0687
Represented By
Weldon L. Moore, III
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeffrey H. Mims
Jeffrey H. Mims, Trustee Founders Square, Suite 560 900 Jackson Street
Dallas, TX 75202
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 10/31/2024 12:07 AM CDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
crditcrd none Wed 10/30 2:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 7)([LINK 24-33420 7] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt number A31919453, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 73 pgs misc Voluntary petition chapter 7 (attorney filer) Wed 10/30 2:00 PM
Non-individual Chapter 7 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Pennington Construction, Inc. (Moore, Weldon)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Wed 10/30 11:00 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Mims, Jeffrey H. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/4/2024 at 12:30 PM via Zoom - Mims: Meeting ID 935 389 4280, Passcode 7328427989, Phone 1-469-218-8233. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is future date. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]