California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-02367
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 1:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Deanna Takupu
Represented By
Kristina Therese Lee
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Michael R Hogue
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Jet Suite X
Represented By
Sierra Taylor Horton
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Kristina Therese Lee
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Michael Alexander Wertheim
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Michael R Hogue
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Berlin
Represented By
Rosemary Amezcua-Moll
Amezcua-Moll And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
29 29 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 04/14 7:47 PM
Fourth STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05/28/2025 filed by PLAINTIFF Daniel Berlin.(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
28 28 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 03/13 9:28 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against JET SUITE X, dba, SUPERIOR AIR CHARTER; DEANNA TAKUPU, an individual; and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive, Daniel Berlin amending Amended Complaint/Petition,19 , filed by Plaintiff Daniel Berlin(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 2:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTEND TIME TO FILE A MOTION FOR REMAND26 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Upon stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing therefore, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: Plaintiff Daniel Berlin shall have up and until March 13, 2025, to file his Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' Superior Air Charter, LLC and Deanna Takapu's present deadline of February 11, 2025, to plead in response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to March 27, 2025, in the event Plaintiff declines to file a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Second Amended Complaint shall be tolled until twenty-one (21) days after the Court enters its ruling on Plaintiffs anticipated motion for remand to state court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
26 26 stip Extension of Time to File Document Tue 02/11 5:15 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Remand and for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu.(Lee, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
25 25 attorney Association of Counsel Fri 02/07 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Michael Hogue on behalf of Defendants Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu. Filed by Defendants Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu (Attorney Michael R Hogue added to party Jet Suite X(pty:dft), Attorney Michael R Hogue added to party Deanna Takupu(pty:dft))(Hogue, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
24 24 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 02/05 2:55 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; re name of party or parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 02/05 2:53 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance,21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; re name of party or parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 02/04 4:25 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristina Therese Lee counsel for Defendants Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu. Sierra Horton is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorneys for Defendants Jet Suite X and Deanna Takupu. (Lee, Kristina)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Appearance Tue 02/04 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristina Therese Lee on behalf of Defendants Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu (Attorney Kristina Therese Lee added to party Jet Suite X(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina Therese Lee added to party Deanna Takupu(pty:dft))(Lee, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
20 20 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 01/22 9:53 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel Berlin re: Amended Complaint/Petition,19 (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
19 19 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 01/21 3:01 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JET SUITE X, dba, SUPERIOR AIR CHARTER; DEANNA TAKUPU, an individual; and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive, Daniel Berlin amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Daniel Berlin(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
18 18 textonly Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail Fri 01/10 8:04 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply16 e-mailed to Sierra.Horton@gtlaw.com bounced due to No longer at Greenberg Traurig as of 12/27/24. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
17 17 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 01/02 7:53 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation [ECF No. 16], and it is hereby APPROVED. Defendants Superior Air Charter, LLC ("Superior") and Deanna Takupu's ("Takupu") (collectively, "Defendants") deadline to plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is continued by twenty-one (21) days from December 30, 2024, to January 21, 2025. Once Plaintiff files and serves his intended amended complaint (the "Amended Complaint") Defendants' responsive pleading deadline will thereafter be within twenty-one (21) days of the filing and service of the Amended Complaint by Plaintiff. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 1/2/2025 (cla)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
16 16 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/30 4:46 PM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu.(Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Third Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline
Monday, December 09, 2024
15 15 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 12/09 6:49 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation [ECF No. 14], and it is hereby APPROVED. Defendants Superior Air Charter, LLC ("Superior") and Deanna Takupu's ("Takupu") (collectively, "Defendants") deadline to plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED by twenty-one (21) days from December 9, 2024, to December 30, 2024. Once Plaintiff files and serves his intended amended complaint (the "Amended Complaint") Defendants' responsive pleading deadline will thereafter be within twenty-one (21) days of the filing and service of the Amended Complaint by Plaintiff. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
14 14 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/06 4:58 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu.(Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
13 13 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 12/02 4:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only12 served on 12/2/2024. (Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 11/19 10:54 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (dve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 11/14 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:24-cv-02367 JWH(ADSx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
10 10 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 11/13 4:03 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 11/06 4:53 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Deanna Takupu answer now due 12/9/2024; Jet Suite X answer now due 12/9/2024, filed by Defendants Deanna Takupu; Jet Suite X.(Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 11/05 3:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu, served on 11/05/2024. (Horton, Sierra)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
7 7 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 11/04 1:42 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
6 6 misc Declaration Wed 10/30 6:54 PM
DECLARATION of Ken Edmondson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Superior Air Charter, LLC, Deanna Takupu. (Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Wed 10/30 6:53 PM
DECLARATION of Michael A. Wertheim re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Superior Air Charter, LLC, Deanna Takupu. (Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/30 6:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Superior Air Charter, LLC (Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 10/30 6:49 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Superior Air Charter, LLC, Deanna Takupu, (Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 10/30 6:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Superior Air Charter, LLC, Deanna Takupu. (Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 10/30 6:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2024 01402039-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-38499211 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants Superior Air Charter, LLC, Deanna Takupu. (Attorney Michael Alexander Wertheim added to party Deanna Takupu(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Alexander Wertheim added to party Superior Air Charter, LLC(pty:dft))(Wertheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 11/04 1:40 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Jet Suite X, Deanna Takupu. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Daniel Berlin. [FILED IN STATE COURT 5/3/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]