Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00238
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 31, 2024 12:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Yunis Sthevens Falla Moreno (1)
Represented By
Julie Pitt Vandiver
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Luis Perez Romo (2)
Represented By
Julie Pitt Vandiver
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul T. Maloney
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/31/2024 1:23 AM PDT
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
6 6 Motion to Partially Unseal Case filed by USA as to Defendant Yunis Sthevens Falla Moreno, Luis Perez Romo. (dino)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Granting6 Motion to Partially Unseal Case as to Yunis Sthevens Falla Moreno (1), Luis Perez Romo (2). Signed on 10/29/2024 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dino)
Related: [-]
8 8 Redacted Complaint pursuant to7 Order on Motion to Partially Unseal Case as to Defendant Yunis Sthevens Falla Moreno, Luis Perez Romo. (dino)
Related: [-]
9 9 Minutes of Proceedings: First Appearance on Complaint held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman as to Yunis Sthevens Falla Moreno on 10/29/2024. ORDER: The Court finds Defendant eligible for appointed counsel and will appoint a CJA Panel attorney to represent Defendant. Defendant advised of rights, waived reading of the Complaint, and waived preliminary hearing. Brady Disclosure Order: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the government is advised of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. See attached order. Defendant does not request release and is detained for risk of non-appearance and as a danger to the community. Defendant may seek review of detention at a later date. Arraignment is set for 11/27/2024 at 1:30 PM in Portland before the duty magistrate judge. Counsel for the defendant is encouraged to discuss with the defendant the option to waive arraignment in accordance with Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 10(b). Any waiver of arraignment should be filed with the Court once the defendant has been charged by Indictment or Information and ahead of the scheduled arraignment date. Counsel Present for the Government: Paul T. Maloney. Counsel Present for Defendant: Julie Vandiver. Restraint Order: NR. (Court Reporter Dennis Apodaca) (Interpreter for Defendant Present: Andre Knaebel) (Spanish) (Oath on file with the court.) (gw)
Related: [-]
10 10 Minutes of Proceedings: First Appearance on Complaint held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman as to Luis Perez Romo on 10/29/2024. ORDER: The Court finds Defendant eligible for appointed counsel and will appoint a CJA Panel attorney to represent Defendant. Defendant advised of rights, waived reading of the Complaint, and waived preliminary hearing. Brady Disclosure Order: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the government is advised of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. See attached order. Defendant does not request release and is detained for risk of non-appearance and as a danger to the community. Defendant may seek review of detention at a later date. Arraignment is set for 11/27/2024 at 1:30 PM in Portland before the duty magistrate judge. Counsel for the defendant is encouraged to discuss with the defendant the option to waive arraignment in accordance with Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 10(b). Any waiver of arraignment should be filed with the Court once the defendant has been charged by Indictment or Information and ahead of the scheduled arraignment date. Counsel Present for the Government: Paul T. Maloney. Counsel Present for Defendant: Julie Vandiver. Restraint Order: NR. (Court Reporter Dennis Apodaca) (Interpreter for Defendant Present: Andre Knaebel) (Spanish) (Oath on file with the court.) (gw)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Defendant Yunis Sthevens Falla Moreno (USM #43928-511). Signed on 10/29/2024 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Defendant Luis Perez Romo (USM #43932-511). Signed on 10/29/2024 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
13 13 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/29/2024 as to Yunis Sthevens Falla Moreno. (dino)
Related: [-]
14 14 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/29/2024 as to Luis Perez Romo. (dino)
Related: [-]