Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-01498
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 31, 2024 2:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Edwin Pelayo (2)
Represented By
Rochelle M. Acevedo
Law Offices Of Rochelle M. Acevedo
contact info
Defendant
Felix Rodriguez-Vargas (1)
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Marina Thais Douenat
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Zachary W. Parsons
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/31/2024 3:04 AM CDT
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
Arrest of Felix Rodriguez-Vargas and Edwin Pelayo (vs1)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad as to Felix Rodriguez-Vargas and Edwin Pelayo. (vs1)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Felix Rodriguez-Vargas. (vs1)
Related: [-]
3 3 4 pgs MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Edwin Pelayo. (vs1)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad:Initial Appearance as to Felix Rodriguez-Vargas held on 10/29/2024. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (rqr)
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Felix Rodriguez-Vargas (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (rqr)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio for Felix Rodriguez-Vargas. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rqr)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Felix Rodriguez-Vargas. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 11/1/2024 10:00 AM before Judge U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rqr)
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad:Initial Appearance as to Edwin Pelayo held on 10/29/2024. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (rqr)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Edwin Pelayo (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (rqr)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Rochelle M. Acevedo for Edwin Pelayo appointed. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rqr)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Edwin Pelayo. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 11/1/2024 10:00 AM before Judge U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rqr)
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marina Thais Douenat appearing for Felix Rodriguez-Vargas . Attorney Marina Thais Douenat added to party Felix Rodriguez-Vargas(pty:dft) (Douenat, Marina)
Related: [-]