Original Case: 4:23-cv-01078

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03022
Typecivil / private / civil rights-prisoner
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 25, 2025 6:27 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
FACEBOOK
Represented By
Eric A. Shumsky
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe
contact info
Alexandra Bursak
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe
contact info
Audrey K. Kwak
Dentons Cohen & Grigsby
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN ANGELILLO
Represented By
John Angelillo
Coal Township SCI
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2025
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: RESTREPO, FREEMAN and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 4. DLD-116. Appellant's Motion for an evidentiary heraing is denied.

Docket last updated: 04/25/2025 6:27 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant John Angelillo in District Court No. 4-23-cv-01078. (KR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court 101824
Att: 3 21 pgs DC Memorandum Opinion 101824
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR)
Related: [-]