Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-01789
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 1:42 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Content Delivery and Security Association Inc
Represented By
Chelsey Lyn Mam
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Ariel A Martinez
Martinez & Farmer LLP
contact info
Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Martinez & Farmer LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Amazon Studios LLC
Represented By
Caesar David Kalinowski
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Macaulay W Ivory
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
John Goldmark
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Content Delivery and Security Association Inc
Represented By
Chelsey Lyn Mam
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Ariel A Martinez
Martinez & Farmer LLP
contact info
Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Martinez & Farmer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amazon Studios LLC
Represented By
Caesar David Kalinowski
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Macaulay W Ivory
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
John Goldmark
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen W Estes, III on behalf of Counter Claimant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc, Defendant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc. (Estes, Allen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
33 33 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Tue 05/06 10:53 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
32 32 service Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 3:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Counter Claimant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc, Defendant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc re31 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, Add and Terminate Attorneys, (Farmer, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
31 31 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 04/21 10:12 AM
ORDER granting Defendant/Counter Claimant's28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. As CDSA is now an unrepresented business entity, CDSA is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than 05/19/2025, why it should not be found in default as to the claims against it and why its counterclaims should not be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (APH) (cc: CDSA via USPS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
30 30 2 pgs respm Declaration Fri 03/28 6:10 PM
DECLARATION of T. Farmer filed by Counter Claimant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc, Defendant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc re28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Mam, Chelsey)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs respm Declaration Fri 03/28 6:07 PM
DECLARATION of R. Atkinson filed by Counter Claimant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc, Defendant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc re28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Mam, Chelsey)
Related: [-]
28 28 5 pgs motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/28 6:06 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Counter Claimant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc, Defendant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc. Noting Date 4/18/2025, (Mam, Chelsey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
27 27 7 pgs order KKE Order Setting and Amending Trial Date and Related Dates (FORM) Tue 03/04 2:46 PM
ORDER AMENDING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Length of Trial: *5 days*. Bench Trial is set for 12/15/2025 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Joinder of Parties due by 4/2/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 4/2/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/19/2025, Discovery Motions due by 6/18/2025, Discovery completed by 7/18/2025, Dispositive motions due by 8/18/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/16/2025, Pretrial Order due by 11/24/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 12/1/2025, Motions in Limine due by 12/1/2025, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 12/1/2025, Deposition Designations due by 12/1/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/04 1:24 PM
ORDER granting Parties'25 Stipulated Motion. The previous trial date and case schedule (Dkt. No.14 ) are VACATED. The courtroom deputy is directed to enter an amended order setting trial date and related dates, consistent with the parties' agreed bench trial date of 12/15/2025, and a deadline to join additional parties and amend pleadings of 4/2/2025. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
25 25 5 pgs motion Stipulated Motion Mon 03/03 4:34 PM
Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Extend Deadline to Join Additional Parties and Amend Pleadings , filed by All Parties. Noting Date 3/3/2025, (Farmer, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
24 24 11 pgs order Protective Order Wed 02/12 1:58 PM
JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
23 23 11 pgs motion Stipulated Motion Fri 02/07 10:48 AM
Joint Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Amazon Studios LLC, Counter Defendant Amazon Studios LLC. Noting Date 2/7/2025, (Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit Redline of Model Protective Order
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
22 22 10 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Wed 02/05 2:33 PM
ORDER on Agreement Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Wed 02/05 2:30 PM
ORDER denying Parties'19 Stipulated Motion Without Prejudice. The parties' motion (Dkt. No.19 ) is DENIED without prejudice, subject to re-filing in compliance with LCR 26(c)(2). Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
20 20 10 pgs motion Stipulated Motion Tue 02/04 4:10 PM
Joint Stipulated MOTION Regarding Discovery of ESI , filed by Plaintiff Amazon Studios LLC, Counter Defendant Amazon Studios LLC. Noting Date 2/4/2025, (Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 11 pgs motion Stipulated Motion Tue 02/04 4:08 PM
Joint Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Amazon Studios LLC, Counter Defendant Amazon Studios LLC. Noting Date 2/4/2025, (Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
18 18 4 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/24 10:14 AM
ORDER granting Parties'17 Stipulated Motion. The parties' stipulated motion (Dkt. No.17 ) is GRANTED. The deadline to join additional parties shall be extended to 3/4/2025. All other deadlines in the case schedule (Dkt. No.14 ) remain in effect. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
17 17 4 pgs motion Stipulated Motion Thu 01/23 1:03 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline to Add Parties , filed by Plaintiff Amazon Studios LLC. Noting Date 1/23/2025, (Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
16 16 5 pgs answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 01/13 1:20 PM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Amazon Studios LLC.(Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
15 15 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/09 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Caesar David Kalinowski on behalf of Plaintiff Amazon Studios LLC, Counter Defendant Amazon Studios LLC. (Kalinowski, Caesar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 7 pgs order 1 - Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/07 3:33 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Length of Trial: *5 days*. Bench Trial is set for 11/17/2025 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Joinder of Parties due by 2/4/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/21/2025, Discovery Motions due by 5/21/2025, Discovery completed by 6/20/2025, Dispositive motions due by 7/21/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 9/18/2025, Pretrial Order due by 10/27/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/3/2025, Motions in Limine due by 11/3/2025, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 11/3/2025, Deposition Designations due by 11/3/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
13 13 6 pgs misc Status Report Tue 01/07 2:43 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT & Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Amazon Studios LLC, Counter Defendant Amazon Studios LLC (Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
12 12 2 pgs discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 12/31 12:30 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Content Delivery and Security Association Inc. (Farmer, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
11 11 15 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 12/16 7:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Amazon Studios LLC by Content Delivery and Security Association Inc.(Farmer, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Wed 11/27 1:25 PM
ORDER granting Parties'9 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline. The Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint no later than 12/16/2024. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs motion Stipulated Motion Wed 11/27 8:35 AM
Stipulated MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT , filed by Defendant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc. Noting Date 11/27/2024, (Farmer, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Tue 11/26 4:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Guy Finley on 11/12/2024, filed by Plaintiff Amazon Studios LLC. (Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 9 pgs order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Tue 11/26 1:17 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/17/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/31/2024, Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/26 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tyler Lawrence Farmer on behalf of Defendant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc. (Farmer, Tyler)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 11/26 3:59 PM
Attorneys Ariel A Martinez, Chelsey Lyn Mam added for Content Delivery and Security Association Inc, per Defendant's6 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Mon 11/04 9:19 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 10/31 4:04 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Content Delivery and Security Association Inc.. (RE)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 10/31 11:48 AM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon Studios LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Amazon Studios LLC. (Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/31 3:52 PM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
2 2 2 pgs misc Praecipe for a Summons Wed 10/30 6:49 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Amazon Studios LLC (Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 6:38 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages and Accounting against defendant(s) Content Delivery and Security Association, Inc. Related [+] filed by Amazon Studios LLC.(Goldmark, John)
Related: [-] ceipt # BWAWDC-8697917
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 21 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet