District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Emmet G Sullivan
Case #: 1:24-cv-03089
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:21 AM EDT
Defendant
BOROUGH OF BELLWOOD
Plaintiff
YOLANDA MONTGOMERY
Represented By
Sean Thurston Hemenway
I.A.M. National Pension Fund
contact info
Plaintiff
NATIONAL IAM BENEFIT TRUST FUND
Represented By
Sean Thurston Hemenway
I.A.M. National Pension Fund
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 motion Default Judgment Mon 04/14 3:58 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to BOROUGH OF BELLWOOD by YOLANDA MONTGOMERY, NATIONAL IAM BENEFIT TRUST FUND.(Hemenway, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 misc Clerks Entry of Default Fri 04/11 11:46 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BOROUGH OF BELLWOOD (zdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 misc Affidavit Mon 02/24 2:59 PM
AFFIDAVIT re4 Summons Returned Executed in Support of Default by NATIONAL IAM BENEFIT TRUST FUND, YOLANDA MONTGOMERY. (Hemenway, Sean) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/24/2025) (zdp)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Status Report Mon 02/24 2:50 PM
STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL IAM BENEFIT TRUST FUND, YOLANDA MONTGOMERY. (Hemenway, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
order .Order Thu 02/13 3:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Status Report by no later than February 27, 2025 in view of the apparently overdue answer to the Complaint. See Docket Entry of January 17, 2025. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/13/2025. (lcegs1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 02/13 3:48 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Status Report due by 2/27/2025. (mac)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 01/17 2:24 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BOROUGH OF BELLWOOD served on 12/3/2024, answer due 12/24/2024 (Hemenway, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
3 3 order Standing Order Mon 11/04 12:13 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/04/24. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 11/01 10:35 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BOROUGH OF BELLWOOD.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 11/01 10:34 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 11:21 AM
COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF BELLWOOD ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11270162) filed by NATIONAL IAM BENEFIT TRUST FUND, YOLANDA MONTGOMERY.(Hemenway, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons