Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:24-cv-24250
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:25 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
MarineMax East, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Bradford
Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Musashi AZ, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Rogers Fertig
Fertig & Gramling
contact info
Darlene M. Lidondici
Fertig & Gramling
contact info
Defendant
MarineMax East, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Bradford
Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP
contact info
Defendant
AZIMUT BENETTI SERVICE USA,INC.
Represented By
Devang B. Desai
Gaebe Mullen Antonelli & Dimatteo
contact info
Defendant
Fortun Insurance, LLC
365 Palermo Ave.
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Eduardo Jose Cruz
Hinshaw , Culbertson, LLC
contact info
Katherine Anne Coba
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Robert S. Glenn, Jr.
Ellis, Painter, Ratterree & Adams 2 East Bryan Streete
Savannah, GA 31401
Plaintiff
Musashi AZ, LLC
Represented By
Christopher Rogers Fertig
Fertig & Gramling
contact info
Darlene M. Lidondici
Fertig & Gramling
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
53 53 respm Reply in Support of Motion Mon 05/12 5:52 PM
Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re32 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss13 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, DEFENDANT FORTUN INSURANCES, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL . filed by Fortun Insurance, LLC. (Cruz, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
52 52 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel Thu 05/08 10:23 AM
ORDER on50 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Devang Desai, Esq. added. Attorney Mark Rocco Antonelli representing AZIMUT BENETTI SERVICE USA,INC. (Defendant) terminated. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 5/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
51 51 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 05/07 4:40 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
50 50 misc Stipulation Wed 05/07 1:58 PM
STIPULATION For Substitution of Counsel of Record by AZIMUT BENETTI SERVICE USA,INC. (Antonelli, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
49 49 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 3:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/29/2026 in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 6/24/2026 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 3/4/2026 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/27/2026.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 5/6/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]