Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01061
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Quantive Business Valuations, LLC
Represented By
Quantive Business Valuations, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info
Katherine Elizabeth Clark
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Alicia M. Bendana
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
court Deficiency Satisfied Tue 04/22 12:13 PM
Deficiency Satisfie Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s) 13 Notice of Deficiency (AP)) (Lew, K
Monday, April 21, 2025
14 14 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Mon 04/21 10:56 AM
First Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)11 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, 13 Notice of Deficiency (AP)) (Caplinger, Christopher
13 13 court Notice of Deficiency (AP) Mon 04/21 9:42 AM
Notice of Deficiency Certificate of Service must include the names and addresses of parties to be served. See Standing Order 2006-4 and Local Rule 2002-1. The corrected filing must be submitted within 2 business days. Otherwise, the court may issue an order to show cause as to why the document was not corrected, or may strike the pleading. You may contact the court for further procedural information Related [+]. Deficiency Correction due by 4/23/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 12 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Thu 04/17 1:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)11 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case) (Clark, Katherine
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
11 11 order Dismissing Case (Order) Wed 04/16 5:56 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 4/16/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss Case Tue 04/15 11:10 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Draft Order
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/05 9:55 AM
Summons Service Executed on Quantive Business Valuations, LLC 2/26/2025 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
8 8 court Summons Issued (AP) Mon 02/24 12:26 PM
Summons Re-issued on Quantive Business Valuations, LLC Answer Due 3/26/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 miscap Request for Issuance of Summons (PF) Fri 02/21 1:24 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:41 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:52 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/05 2:34 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 11/4/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/05 10:56 AM
Summons Service Executed on Quantive Business Valuations, LLC 11/5/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Thu 10/31 2:35 PM
Summons Issued on Quantive Business Valuations, LLC Answer Due 12/2/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 1:18 PM
Adversary case 24-01061 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Secs. 544, 548 and 550 by Dwayne M. Murray against Quantive Business Valuations, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet