Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01062
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cooper CPA Group, P.C.
Represented By
Cooper CPA Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info
Alicia M. Bendana
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Katherine Elizabeth Clark
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 04/16 5:28 PM
Order Granting Joint Ex Parte Motion to Continue Docket Call for Trial and Related Deadlines. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 4/15/25 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/18/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 4 Order,24 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray, Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.
Monday, April 14, 2025
24 24 motion Continue Trial (Motion) (AP) Mon 04/14 4:56 PM
Joint Motion to Continue Trial on Docket Call for Trial and Related Deadlines Filed by Cooper CPA Group, P.C., Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Bendana, Alicia
Thursday, April 03, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint (AP) Thu 04/03 4:13 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Cooper CPA Group, P.C. (Barriere, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/25 2:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Samuel Riccardi on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray. (Riccardi, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP) Wed 02/12 12:26 PM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on February 12, 2025. (Sylvester, Kenisha)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
court Hearing Held Wed 02/12 9:02 AM
Hearing Held Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding). RULING: Motion Denied. Order-Court (Hess, Karen
Thursday, February 06, 2025
20 20 order Generic Motion (Order) (AP) Thu 02/06 2:49 PM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Participate Remotely. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 2/6/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 18 Generic Motion filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.
19 19 order Generic Motion (Order) (AP) Thu 02/06 2:46 PM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Participate Remotely for the February 11, 2025 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Related Opposition IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 2/6/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 17 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
18 18 motion zGeneric Motion (Motion) (AP) Thu 02/06 9:59 AM
Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Participate Remotely for the February 11, 2025 Hearing Filed by Cooper CPA Group, P.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.) (Caneco, Joseph
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
17 17 motion zGeneric Motion (Motion) (AP) Tue 02/04 6:18 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Participate Remotely for the February 11, 2025 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Related Opposition Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.,16 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bendana, Alicia
16 16 answer Opposition Tue 02/04 6:13 PM
Opposition with Certificate of Service to Cooper CPA, Group, P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Transfer Venue Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.) Hearing scheduled for 2/11/2025 at 03:30 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Bendana, Alicia
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
court Deficiency Satisfied Wed 01/15 11:01 AM
Deficiency Satisfie Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s) 13 Notice of Deficiency (AP)) (Lew, K
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 01/14 5:16 PM
First Amended Notice of Hearing by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501 Filed by Filed by Cooper CPA Group, P.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.) Hearing scheduled for 2/11/2025 at 03:30 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Caneco, Joseph). Related document(s)14 Notice of Hearing filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.. Modified on 1/15/2025 to add link (Lew, K)
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 01/14 10:25 AM
Notice of Hearing by *SECTION A TeleConference Line: 1-504-517-1385 Access Code 129611 Filed by Filed by Cooper CPA Group, P.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.) Hearing scheduled for 2/5/2025 at 01:00 PM by *SECTION A TeleConference Line: 1-504-517-1385 Access Code 129611. (Caneco, Joseph
Monday, January 13, 2025
13 13 court Notice of Deficiency (AP) Mon 01/13 3:39 PM
Notice of Deficiency Motion requires a notice of hearing with 21-day notice and certificate of service. The corrected filing must be submitted within 2 business days. Otherwise, the court may issue an order to show cause as to why the document was not corrected, or may strike the pleading. You may contact the court for further procedural information Related [+]. Deficiency Correction due by 1/15/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP) Fri 01/10 2:45 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding or, Alternatively, Transfer Venue Filed by Cooper CPA Group, P.C. (Barriere, Brent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
11 11 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Wed 12/11 11:54 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Cooper CPA Group, P.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)10 Order on Motion to Extend Time) (Nobles, Cherie
10 10 order Extend Time (Order) (AP) Wed 12/11 11:45 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 12/11/24. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Cooper CPA Group, P.C.
utility Reset Answer Deadline (AP) Wed 12/11 11:45 AM
Cooper CPA Group, P.C. Answer Deadline Reset for 1/10/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
9 9 motion Extend Time (Motion) (AP) Tue 12/10 5:24 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings Filed by Cooper CPA Group, P.C. (Nobles, Cherie)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/10 5:22 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Cherie D. Nobles on behalf of Cooper CPA Group, P.C.. (Nobles, Cherie)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/10 5:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brent B. Barriere on behalf of Cooper CPA Group, P.C.. (Barriere, Brent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:52 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/05 2:36 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 11/4/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/05 10:57 AM
Summons Service Executed on Cooper CPA Group, P.C. 11/5/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Thu 10/31 2:37 PM
Summons Issued on Cooper CPA Group, P.C. Answer Due 12/2/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 1:25 PM
Adversary case 24-01062 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Secs. 544, 547, 548 and 550 by Dwayne M. Murray against Cooper CPA Group, P.C.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet