Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01064
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Premier Laboratory Services, LLC
Represented By
Premier Laboratory Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Alicia M. Bendana
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info
Katherine Elizabeth Clark
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
25 25 order Continue Hearing (Order) Mon 04/21 5:00 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Docket Call for Trial and Related Deadlines. Related [+] Signed on 4/21/25. Hearing scheduled for 9/24/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 4 Order,24 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 motion Continue Hearing Thu 04/17 4:24 PM
Consent Motion to Continue Hearing On April 23, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-] 4 Order
Att: 1 Draft Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint (AP) Mon 03/10 3:51 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by Premier Laboratory Services, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)19 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray) (Greenberg, Olivia
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
22 22 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Tue 02/25 3:38 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Premier Laboratory Services, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)21 Generic Order) (Greenberg, Olivia
Thursday, February 20, 2025
21 21 order Generic Motion (Order) (AP) Thu 02/20 3:52 PM
Order Granting Motion with Consent for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 2/20/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 20 Generic Motion filed by Defendant Premier Laboratory Services, LLC
utility Reset Answer Deadline (AP) Thu 02/20 3:53 PM
Premier Laboratory Services, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 3/10/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
20 20 motion zGeneric Motion (Motion) (AP) Mon 02/17 9:59 AM
Ex Parte Motion with Consent for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by Premier Laboratory Services, LLC (Greenberg, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 06, 2025
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/06 1:54 PM
Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Fraudulent and/or Preferential Transfers by Christopher T. Caplinger on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray against Premier Laboratory Services, LLC Related [+]. (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
18 18 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Tue 01/28 3:17 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Premier Laboratory Services, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)17 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, Order on Motion for Leave) (Greenberg, Olivia
Thursday, January 16, 2025
17 17 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP) Thu 01/16 3:48 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, Granting Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 1/16/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Premier Laboratory Services, LLC
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
court Hearing Held Wed 01/15 10:41 AM
Hearing Hel Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding). RULING: Motion is granted with the right to amend. Order-Caplinger. (Hess, Karen
Monday, January 13, 2025
16 16 order Generic Motion (Order) Mon 01/13 2:57 PM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Participate Remotely. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 1/13/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 13 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Mon 01/13 12:19 PM
Notice of Hearing by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501 Filed by Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)14 Motion for Leave filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray) Hearing scheduled for 2/11/2025 at 03:30 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caplinger, Christopher
14 14 motion Leave (Motion) (AP) Mon 01/13 10:25 AM
Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint with Incorporated Memorandum Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, January 10, 2025
13 13 motion zGeneric Motion Fri 01/10 2:48 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Participate Remotely Related [+] Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Premier Laboratory Services, LLC
Att: 1 Draft Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 answer Objection Tue 01/07 5:54 PM
Objection with Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Premier Laboratory Services, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2025 at 10:00 AM by *GoTo Video Conference. (Caplinger, Christopher
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 01/07 2:25 PM
Summons Service Executed on Premier Laboratory Services, LLC 12/10/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
10 10 court Summons Issued (AP) Tue 12/10 12:35 PM
Summons Re-Issued on Premier Laboratory Services, LLC Answer Due 1/9/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
9 9 miscap Request for Issuance of Summons (PF) Mon 12/09 2:40 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Mon 12/02 4:39 PM
Notice of Hearing by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501 and Deadline to Respond Filed by Filed by Premier Laboratory Services, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Premier Laboratory Services, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2025 at 10:00 AM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss)(Greenberg, Olivia
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP) Mon 12/02 4:37 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding to Avoid and Recover Fraudulent and/or Preferential Transfers Filed by Premier Laboratory Services, LLC (Greenberg, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:57 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/05 2:42 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 11/4/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/05 10:58 AM
Summons Service Executed on Premier Laboratory Services, LLC 11/5/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Thu 10/31 4:11 PM
Summons Issued on Premier Laboratory Services, LLC Answer Due 12/2/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 1:34 PM
Adversary case 24-01064 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Fraudulent and/or Preferential Transfers by Dwayne M. Murray against Premier Laboratory Services, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet