Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01066
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity Employer Insurance Services, Inc. and Red River Bancshares Inc. f/k/a Fidelity Bank
Represented By
Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity Employer Insurance Services, Inc. and Red River Bancshares Inc. f/k/a Fidelity Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Katherine Elizabeth Clark
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info
Alicia M. Bendana
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
18 18 order Continue Hearing (Order) Thu 04/17 3:43 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Trial Docket Call Related [+] Signed on 4/17/25. Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 4 Order,17 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
17 17 motion Continue Hearing Wed 04/16 3:37 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On April 23, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-] 4 Order
Att: 1 Draft Order
Monday, April 14, 2025
16 16 court Notice of Deficiency (AP) Mon 04/14 10:58 AM
Notice of Deficiency Other Reason: Please submit an Order to Chambers according to the Administrative Procedures/Local Rules. The corrected filing must be submitted within 2 business days. Otherwise, the court may issue an order to show cause as to why the document was not corrected, or may strike the pleading. You may contact the court for further procedural information Related [+]. Deficiency Correction due by 4/16/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Fidelity National Management Services, LLC
Friday, April 04, 2025
15 15 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/04 10:33 AM
Summons Service Executed on Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity Employer Insurance Services, Inc. and Red River Bancshares Inc. f/k/a Fidelity Bank 4/3/2025 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
14 14 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/04 10:32 AM
Summons Service Executed on Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity Employer Insurance Services, Inc. and Red River Bancshares Inc. f/k/a Fidelity Bank 4/3/2025 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/04 10:31 AM
Summons Service Executed on Fidelity National Management Services, LLC 4/3/2025 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 04/04 10:29 AM
Summons Service Executed on Fidelity National Management Services, LLC 4/3/2025 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
11 11 court Summons Issued (AP) Fri 03/28 1:43 PM
Summons Re-Issued on Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity Employer Insurance Services, Inc. and Red River Bancshares Inc. f/k/a Fidelity Bank Answer Due 4/28/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Summons Issued (AP) Fri 03/28 1:41 PM
Summons Re-Issued on Fidelity National Management Services, LLC Answer Due 4/28/2025. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 miscap Request for Issuance of Summons (PF) Thu 03/27 2:01 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/18 3:54 PM
Amended Complaint by Christopher T. Caplinger on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray against Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity Employer Insurance Services, Inc. and Red River Bancshares Inc. f/k/a Fidelity Bank Related [+]. (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
7 7 motion Extend Time (Motion) (AP) Wed 12/11 11:33 AM
First Motion to Extend Time with Certificate of Service Filed by Fidelity National Management Services, LLC (Stern, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 2:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/05 2:47 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 11/4/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/05 11:00 AM
Summons Service Executed on Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity Employer Insurance Services, Inc. and Red River Bancshares Inc. f/k/a Fidelity Bank 11/5/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Thu 10/31 4:15 PM
Summons Issued on Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity Employer Insurance Services, Inc. and Red River Bancshares Inc. f/k/a Fidelity Bank Answer Due 12/2/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 1:45 PM
Adversary case 24-01066 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Secs. 544, 548 and 550 by Dwayne M. Murray against Fidelity National Management Services, LLC, Fidelity Employer Insurance Services, Inc. and Red River Bancshares Inc. f/k/a Fidelity Bank. Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet