Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-11254

Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-ap-01068
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Global Imaging, LLP
Represented By
Global Imaging, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dwayne M. Murray
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info
Katherine Elizabeth Clark
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Alicia M. Bendana
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
court Hearing (Document) Stricken (AP) Wed 04/16 10:21 AM
Hearing Removed from Calendar - Default Judgment entered 4/11/2025 Related [+]. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 4 Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 order Default Judgment (Order) (AP) Fri 04/11 2:10 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 4/11/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Thursday, April 10, 2025
court Hearing Held Thu 04/10 8:21 AM
Hearing Hel Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray): RULING: Motion is granted. Order - Riccardi (Hess, Karen
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 order Generic Motion (Order) Thu 04/03 4:09 PM
Order Granting Motion for Permission to Appear Remotely IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Related [+] Signed on 4/3/25. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 12 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
12 12 motion zGeneric Motion Thu 04/03 2:56 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Appear Remotely Related [+] Filed by Katherine Elizabeth Clark of Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray (Clark, Katherine)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Att: 1 Draft Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 02/26 2:34 PM
Notice of Hearing by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501 Filed by Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray) Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 03:30 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/25 2:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Samuel Riccardi on behalf of Dwayne M. Murray. (Riccardi, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 motion Default Judgment (Motion) (AP) Fri 02/21 11:27 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Global Imaging LLP Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 02/18 4:35 PM
Clerk's Entry of Defaul Related [+]. (Lew, K)
Related: [-] 7 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Dwayne M. Murray
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 miscap Request for Entry of Default (PF) Fri 02/14 1:30 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Global Imaging Filed by Dwayne M. Murray (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/13 4:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dwayne M. Murray on behalf of Dwayne M. (Liquidating Trustee) Murray. (Murray, Dwayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 miscap Certificate of Service (PF) Fri 11/08 3:00 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dwayne M. Murray Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)4 Order) (Caplinger, Christopher
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 11/05 2:51 PM
Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order. Docket Call for this trial will be held on April 23, 2025 at 2:00 pm at 3rd Floor, Courtroom 5, 800 Lafayette St, Lafayette, LA 70501. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on 11/4/24 Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM by U. S. Courthouse, 800 Lafayette Street, Courtroom 5, Lafayette, Louisiana 70501. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/05 11:01 AM
Summons Service Executed on Global Imaging, LLP 11/5/2024 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (AP) Thu 10/31 4:23 PM
Summons Issued on Global Imaging, LLP Answer Due 12/2/2024. (Lew, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/30 4:15 PM
Adversary case 24-01068 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Unauthorized Transfers by Dwayne M. Murray against Global Imaging, LLP. Fee Amount $350. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover sheet