Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Sara E Hill
Referred: Mark T Steele
Case #: 4:24-cv-00527
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Manhattan Redi-Mix Industries LLC
Plaintiff
Manhattan Construction Company
Represented By
Sharolyn Whiting-Ralston
Mcafee & Taft, P.C.
contact info
Mary Quinn-Cooper
Mcafee & Taft (tulsa)
contact info
Rachel Blue
Mcafee & Taft (tulsa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Manhattan Construction Group LLC
Represented By
Sharolyn Whiting-Ralston
Mcafee & Taft, P.C.
contact info
Mary Quinn-Cooper
Mcafee & Taft (tulsa)
contact info
Rachel Blue
Mcafee & Taft (tulsa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
24 24 misc Report on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks Wed 03/19 11:29 AM
REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Errata/Correction to Document Wed 03/19 9:49 AM
ERRATA/CORRECTION Related [+] by Manhattan Construction Company, Manhattan Construction Group LLC (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-] 22 Stipulation of Dismissal
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Wed 03/19 11:24 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated:9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief in Support ,7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Brief in Support ) (see document number23 ) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/18 1:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Manhattan Construction Company, Manhattan Construction Group LLC (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
21 21 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Wed 01/29 12:20 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Manhattan Construction Company, Manhattan Construction Group LLC (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Tue 01/21 3:15 PM
ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/30/2025) (ll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/08 9:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Manhattan Redi-Mix Industries LLC Related [+] by Manhattan Construction Group LLC, Manhattan Construction Company (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Fri 11/08 4:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill upon request of counsel the hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (doc. 7) is stricken , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Mon 11/04 9:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill the Motion hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (doc. 7) set on 11/14/2024 at 1:30 p.m. is STRICKEN and RESET for 11/13/2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Sara E. Hill , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sara E Hill) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Brief in Support
Friday, November 01, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 11/01 12:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill setting a Motion hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (doc. 7) for 11/14/2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Sara E. Hill , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sara E Hill) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Brief in Support
Thursday, October 31, 2024
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 10/31 2:57 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Rooney Holdings, Inc. for Manhattan Construction Group LLC) by Manhattan Construction Group LLC (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 10/31 2:39 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Manhattan Construction Group, LLC for Manhattan Construction Company) by Manhattan Construction Company (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn) Modified on 10/31/2024 - ENTERED IN ERROR - Duplicate to DKT# 12 (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 10/31 2:34 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Manhattan Construction Group, LLC for Manhattan Construction Company) by Manhattan Construction Company (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Thu 10/31 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Manhattan Redi-Mix Industries LLC (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
10 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge John D. Russell and Magistrate Judge Mark T. Steele, changing case number to 24-cv-00527-JDR-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Injunction - Preliminary Thu 10/31 1:09 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief in Support by Manhattan Construction Company, Manhattan Construction Group LLC (With attachments) (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Report on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks Thu 10/31 12:52 PM
REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 10/31 12:16 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Brief in Support by Manhattan Construction Company, Manhattan Construction Group LLC (With attachments) (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-]
6 6 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Thu 10/31 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Manhattan Construction Group LLC and Manhattan Construction Company to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 10/31 10:51 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mary Quinn-Cooper on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 10/31 10:47 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sharolyn Whiting-Ralston on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-]
2 2 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT against Manhattan Redi-Mix Industries LLC (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3098715) by Manhattan Construction Group LLC, Manhattan Construction Company (With attachments) (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10/31 10:24 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Manhattan Construction Company, Manhattan Construction Group LLC (Whiting-Ralston, Sharolyn)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Thu 10/31 10:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Manhattan Construction Group LLC and Manhattan Construction Company to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Case - Assigned to District Judge (declination of consent only) Case - Number Changed Thu 10/31 1:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge John D. Russell and Magistrate Judge Mark T. Steele, changing case number to 24-cv-00527-JDR-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Case - Recuse Judge Case - Number Changed Thu 10/31 5:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directly: this case having been returned to the Court Clerk for random reassignment, and random reassignment having been completed , recusing Judge John D Russell. Judge Sara E Hill reassigned to case., changing case number to 24-cv-00527-SEH-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]