Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen S Marston
Case #: 2:24-cv-05849
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536
Plaintiff
SCOTT VANARSDALE
14679 N. OAK STREET BOX 355
CARBON, IN 47837
Represented By
ANTHONY G. SIMON
The Simon Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 11/01 10:14 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 11/1/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/31 4:09 PM
NOTICE by SCOTT VANARSDALE of Completed Updated Designation Form (SIMON, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
1 1 50 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 10/31 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17850613.), filed by SCOTT VANARSDALE.(SIMON, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form Designation Form
misc MDL Member Case Thu 10/31 2:46 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-5849. (sbt)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Thu 10/31 2:47 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Designation form (Outdated Form, Please Re-file Using Updated Form on the Court's Website). (sbt)
Related: [-]