Colorado District Court
Judge:Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:24-cv-03044
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12181 American With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 2:19 AM MDT
Defendant
Palmer Plaza, LLC
Represented By
Adam F. Aldrich
Aldrich Legal LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Flores
Represented By
Douglas S. Schapiro
Schapiro Law Group, P.L.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 01/10 7:58 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case Text Only Entry (lgale, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 01/09 10:37 AM
STIPULATION Joint - of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Carlos Flores.(Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Monday, December 30, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/30 10:36 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 30 December 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file dismissal papers no later than January 21, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for February 3, 2025, is VACATED. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 22, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Sun 12/22 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Carlos Flores (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 12/09 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam F. Aldrich on behalf of Palmer Plaza, LLCAttorney Adam F. Aldrich added to party Palmer Plaza, LLC(pty:dft) (Aldrich, Adam)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 12/09 10:27 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Flores. Palmer Plaza, LLC waiver sent on 12/9/2024, answer due 2/7/2025. (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order Mon 11/18 11:07 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 18 November 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/27/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document
5 5 order Minute Order Mon 11/18 10:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-1] is January 21, 2025. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 11/18/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 10/31 12:50 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (agryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 10/31 12:50 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons Request Thu 10/31 11:31 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Palmer Plaza, LLC by Plaintiff Carlos Flores. (Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Palmer Plaza, LLC (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9961311)Attorney Douglas S. Schapiro added to party Carlos Flores(pty:pla), filed by Carlos Flores.(Schapiro, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt,
Att: 2 Exhibit Selfie,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons