California Eastern District Court
Judge:Sheila K Oberto
Case #: 1:24-cv-01333
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Terminated:Nov 01, 2024
Defendant
Brent W. Reden
Defendant
Chechi
Defendant
Shelise Munoz
Plaintiff
Anthony R. Turner

GPO Nov 01 2024
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2024. (Xiong, J.)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
misc Other Court Case Number Thu 11/07 8:19 PM
OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from California Northern District case number 3:24-cv-07718. (Gonzalez, R)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - District Fri 11/01 3:53 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2024. (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 11/01 3:53 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Anthony R. Turner. (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Thu 10/31 1:19 PM
(1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Chechi, Shelise Munoz, Brent W. Reden by Anthony R. Turner. (Xiong, J.)
Related: [-]