Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Maarten Vermaat
Case #: 1:24-cv-01152
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:23 AM EDT
defendant
The Road, Inc.
Represented By
Charles D. Lee
Lee Schwalb, LLC
contact info
Myndee M. Lee
Lee Schwalb, LLC
contact info
defendant
Virhaan, Inc.
Represented By
Charles D. Lee
Lee Schwalb, LLC
contact info
Myndee M. Lee
Lee Schwalb, LLC
contact info
early neutral evaluator
Early Neutral Evaluator
Represented By
Dean F. Pacific
Warner Norcross & Judd Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Jesus Hernandez
an individual 2232 Stafford Ave Sw.
Grand Rapids, MI 49507
Represented By
Robert Anthony Alvarez, Sr.
Avanti Law Group, Pllc (mi)
contact info
Victor Manuel Jimenez, Jr.
Avanti Law Group, Pllc (mi)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
31 31 order Notice Rescheduling Hearing Wed 04/30 11:19 AM
NOTICE rescheduling early settlement conference for 6/23/2025 at 01:30 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; joint status report shall be due 6/16/2024. The video link27 remains the same. (cam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/29 9:43 AM
ORDER granting28 motion for protective order; granting STIPULATION29 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (mcb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
order Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document) Mon 04/28 9:15 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER regarding Defendants' motion29 to Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
29 29 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Fri 04/25 7:44 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for Protective Order by defendants The Road, Inc., Virhaan, Inc. (Lee, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
order Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document) Mon 04/21 8:01 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to defer depositions28 to Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
28 28 motion Protective Order Fri 04/18 5:04 PM
MOTION for protective order by defendants The Road, Inc., Virhaan, Inc.; (Lee, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
27 27 misc Restricted Access Court Document Tue 04/15 2:31 PM
(RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Zoom link for 6/5/2025 settlement conference [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for The Road, Inc., Virhaan, Inc., Jesus Hernandez only] (cam)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order Regarding Settlement Conference Tue 04/15 2:29 PM
ORDER regarding settlement conference: early settlement conference set for 6/5/2025 at 01:30 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
25 25 service Proof of Service Mon 04/14 4:45 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jesus Hernandez for Plaintiff's Discovery Requests and 30b6 Deposition Notices (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/11 9:19 AM
ORDER granting to an extent STIPULATION to modify the form of alternative dispute resolution23 ; the parties shall, not later than 4/18/2025, contact Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat's chambers to schedule an early settlement conference; the parties shall notify the Early Neutral Evaluator of the modification; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order (separate documents) Mon 04/07 3:49 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER To Modify The Dispute Resolution Process by plaintiff Jesus Hernandez (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 03/26 8:32 AM
ORDER referring case to EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION: Early Neutral Evaluator Dean F. Pacific added; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
21 21 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Tue 03/25 4:27 PM
SELECTION of Dean Pacific as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Jesus Hernandez (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
20 20 order Case Management Order Tue 03/11 12:41 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 By Telephone Tue 03/11 12:00 PM
MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before District Judge Jane M. Beckering (Court Reporter: not recorded) (rmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
18 18 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Tue 03/04 10:59 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Tue 02/18 4:02 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 3/11/2025 at 11:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 3/4/2025; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/18 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Service of Rule 68 Offer of Judgment by defendants The Road, Inc., Virhaan, Inc. (Lee, Myndee)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 02/17 11:33 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint14 with affirmative defenses by The Road, Inc., Virhaan, Inc. (Lee, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/03 4:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jesus Hernandez (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
13 13 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/03 3:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Virhaan Inc. (Lee, Myndee)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/03 3:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Road Inc. (Lee, Myndee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/29 4:49 PM
First Amended ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by The Road Inc., Virhaan Inc. (Lee, Myndee)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/29 9:34 AM
ORDER that Defendants file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/29 9:33 AM
ORDER striking answer7 , amended by8 ; Defendants shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/28 4:58 PM
First Amended ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by The Road Inc., Virhaan Inc. (Lee, Myndee)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/28 4:40 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by The Road Inc., Virhaan Inc. (Lee, Myndee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/22 10:39 AM
SUMMONS returned executed for All Defendants; defendant The Road Inc. served 1/7/25, answer due 1/28/25; defendant Virhaan Inc. served 1/9/25, answer due 1/30/25 (Alvarez, Robert) Modified text on 1/22/2025 (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 order Notice of Impending Dismissal Mon 01/06 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL: Plaintiff to timely complete service of process or file a verified petition RE: Service of Process by 1/29/2025, or the case will be dismissed without prejudice; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 10/31 3:50 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants The Road Inc., Virhaan Inc. (ems)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Thu 10/31 3:47 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (ems)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Thu 10/31 3:03 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jesus Hernandez (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Thu 10/31 3:05 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Jesus Hernandez in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7528649 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 10/31 3:06 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Victor Manuel Jimenez, Jr on behalf of plaintiff Jesus Hernandez (Jimenez, Victor)
Related: [-]