New Jersey District Court
Judge:Karen M Williams
Referred: Ann Marie Donio
Case #: 1:24-cv-10206
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
ORWAK NORTH AMERICA INC.
Represented By
SEAN COLLIER
The Basil Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
GREENYARD LOGISTICS USA, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL DAVID ZAHLER
Hodgson Russ LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
misc Docket Annotation (public) Tue 04/29 3:50 PM
NOTICE: The telephonic status conference on 5/20/2025 shall convene at 1:45 P.M. PLEASE NOTE THE CHANGE IN TIME. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions: 1-856-210-8988 / 162 137 372#. (slc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 5:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 6/10/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988 / 721 441 29#. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/20/2025 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988 / 162 137 372#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/28/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 04/28 11:48 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Settlement Conference held via telephone on 4/28/2025. (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
misc Docket Annotation (public) Thu 04/17 9:27 AM
NOTICE: Settlement Memoranda due to Judge Donio's Chambers. See Text Order dated 3/26/2025 and Order Concerning Settlement Conferences dated 2/10/2025. Settlement Memoranda shall not be filed electronically. (sb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
18 18 order Order Wed 03/26 9:20 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has RESCHEDULED the telephonic settlement conference for 4/28/2025 at 11:30 A.M. Clients with settlement authority shall be directed to be available via telephone. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions: 1-856-210-8988 / 614 208 859#. Additionally, settlement memoranda shall be EXCHANGED and submitted to Judge Donio's Chambers at least one week prior to the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/26/2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 order Order Tue 03/25 3:12 PM
TEXT ORDER: Defendant's letter request [D.I. 16] to adjourn the settlement conference scheduled for April 1, 2025 shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED. A new date will be set. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/25/2025. (sb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Mon 03/24 6:55 PM
Letter from Sean Collier Requesting Adjournment of April 1st Settlement Conference and Extension of Time to File Position Statements With the Court. (COLLIER, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
15 15 order Order Tue 03/04 10:48 AM
TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, and for good cause shown, the telephonic settlement conference on 3/7/2025 shall be, and is hereby, ADJOURNED. The Court has RESCHEDULED the telephonic settlement conference for 4/1/2025 at 1:45 P.M. Clients with settlement authority shall be directed to be available via telephone. Counsel shall utilize the same dial-in instructions previously provided by the Court. Additionally, settlement memoranda shall be EXCHANGED and submitted to Judge Donio's Chambers no later than 3/25/2025. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/4/2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Mon 03/03 9:53 PM
Letter from Michael D. Zahler Re: Request for Adjournment of March 7th Settlement Conference and Extension in Time to File Position Statements With the Court. (ZAHLER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
misc Docket Annotation (public) Wed 02/26 9:41 AM
NOTICE: Settlement Memoranda due to Judge Donio's Chambers. See Text Order and Order Concerning Settlement Conferences dated 2/10/2025. Settlement Memoranda shall not be filed electronically. (sb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
13 13 4 pgs order Order Mon 02/10 12:23 PM
ORDER CONCERNING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/10/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order Mon 02/10 10:12 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a telephonic settlement conference on 3/7/2025 at 10:30 A.M. Clients with settlement authority shall be directed to be available via telephone. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-856-210-8988 / 614 208 859#. Additionally, counsel shall EXCHANGE and submit settlement memoranda directly to Judge Donio's Chambers at least one week prior to the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/10/2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 02/05 8:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 2/4/2025. (sb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
11 11 order Order Wed 01/22 9:58 AM
TEXT ORDER: The in-person initial scheduling conference on 2/4/2025 at 10:30 A.M. shall be, and is hereby, CONVERTED to a TELEPHONIC initial scheduling conference. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-856-210-8988 / 133 559 593#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/22/2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
10 10 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 01/21 2:49 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by GREENYARD LOGISTICS USA, INC..(ZAHLER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
9 9 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Mon 01/06 11:23 AM
AMENDED Order Initial Conference set for 2/4/2025 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 01/06/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
8 8 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Mon 01/06 10:34 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 2/3/2025 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/6/2025. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 01/03 7:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ORWAK NORTH AMERICA INC. identifying Orwak AB as Corporate Parent..(COLLIER, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/03 7:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by ORWAK NORTH AMERICA INC..(COLLIER, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/08 12:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREENYARD LOGISTICS USA, INC.. ORWACK NORTH AMERICA INC. waiver sent on 11/4/2024, answer due 1/3/2025. (ZAHLER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 11/01 4:51 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by GREENYARD LOGISTICS USA, INC.. (ZAHLER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 11/01 1:41 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ORWACK NORTH AMERICA INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Fri 11/01 12:27 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Fri 11/01 1:40 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action: Was changed to adhere to the originating Complaint. Party Information: Party names need to be entered in capital letters . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (aji, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 11/01 1:40 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 10/31 4:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greenyard Logistics USA, Inc. identifying Greenyard USA Co. as Corporate Parent.. (ZAHLER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Orwak North America Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15777953) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Greenyard Logistics USA, Inc..(ZAHLER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 11/01 12:23 PM
Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
Related: [-]