New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jamel K Semper
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:24-cv-10196
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
EDISON HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC
Notice Only
PHV GEORGE WICKHORST, III
Plaintiff
JUAN CARLOS GIL
Represented By
R. EDWARD ROSENBERG
Sorondo Rosenberg Legal PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC.
Terminated: 02/25/2025


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 service Summons Issued Wed 02/26 9:31 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to EDISON HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 02/26 8:56 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to EDISON HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff Wed 02/26 9:26 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the11 SUMMONS ISSUED filed by the Clerk's office on 2/26/2025 was docketed in error. Please disregard. The case caption was not changed before the summons was issued. The Clerks Office will now re-issue the summons. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 service Summons - Request for Issue Tue 02/25 4:24 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by JUAN CARLOS GIL as to EDISON HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC. (ROSENBERG, R.)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/25 9:09 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against EDISON HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, filed by JUAN CARLOS GIL.(ROSENBERG, R.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 02/10 12:44 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's6 Motion to for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the proposed Amended Complaint, on or before 2/18/2025. The caption of this case shall be amended to reflect the caption set forth on the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall serve the Amended Complaint on newly added defendant Edison Hospitality Group, LLC. A responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint shall thereafter be filed in accordance with the time prescribed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 2/10/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
7 7 misc Proposed Order Fri 02/07 3:05 PM
Proposed Order on Motion to Amend by JUAN CARLOS GIL re6 MOTION to Amend/Correct . (ROSENBERG, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/29 10:12 AM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Amend/Correct . Motion set for 3/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
6 6 motion Amend/Correct Tue 01/28 1:52 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct by JUAN CARLOS GIL.(ROSENBERG, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, December 30, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 12/30 2:40 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, GEORGE WICKHORST, III, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (wh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 12/27 11:42 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice George Wickhorst to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ROSENBERG, R.)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Fri 12/27 11:05 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee: $250.00, receipt number NEW51270 as to GEORGE WICKHORST, III. (ps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/19 3:38 PM
ORDER granting the3 Motion for the pro hac vice admission of George Wickhorst III, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 11/18/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Fri 11/15 4:04 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the3 Motion to Admit George Wickhorst III as Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by R. EDWARD ROSENBERG on 11/12/2024 contains an improper electronic signature as to George Wickhorst III. Only Registered Users and Local Counsel are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SIGNATURE. Kindly refer to the CM/ECF Event, Exhibit (to document) and link the document to the3 Motion upon resubmission. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/15 4:06 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 12/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 3:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JUAN CARLOS GIL.(ROSENBERG, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of George Wickhorst
Friday, November 01, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 11/01 2:28 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Fri 11/01 2:26 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Attachments to the Complaint1 filed by R. Rosenberg on 10/31/2024 were uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your documents have been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT against CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number BNJDC-15777746), filed by JUAN CARLOS GIL.(ROSENBERG, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/31 4:52 PM
Judge Jamel K. Semper and Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams added. (ps)
Related: [-]