Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:James D Peterson
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:24-cv-00773
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 3:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Timothy C. Blokhuis, LLC
Represented By
Sara J. Ackermann
Ruder Ware L.L.S.C.
contact info
Nicole L. Stangl
Ruder Ware
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanessa M. Wiese
Represented By
Nicholas E. Fairweather
Hawks Quindel, S.C.
contact info
Emma Knatterud-Johnson
Hawks Quindel, S.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Pete's Meat Service, LLC
Terminated: 11/27/2024
Represented By
Sara J. Ackermann
Ruder Ware L.L.S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) - public docket entry Wed 04/02 9:18 AM
Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (acd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
12 12 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/31 4:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Fairweather, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 03/27 2:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman: Settlement Conference held on 3/27/2025 during which the parties reached a settlement agreement. [4:19] (arw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
Reset Deadlines and Hearings: Settlement Conference reset for 3/27/2025 at 9:00 AM by Zoom video conference. (arw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 order Text Only Order Wed 02/26 8:47 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' joint motion to extend defendant Timothy C. Blokhuis, LLC's time to answer, Dkt.10 , is GRANTED. Defendant has until April 15, 2025, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The parties should not expect another extension absent good cause shown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 2/26/2025. (jls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 motion Stipulation Tue 02/25 4:39 PM
Second Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Pete's Meat Service, LLC, Timothy C. Blokhuis, LLC. (Ackermann, Sara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
9 9 order Text Only Order Thu 01/23 9:25 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' joint motion to extend defendant Timothy C. Blokhuis, LLC's time to answer, Dkt.8 , is GRANTED. Defendant has until February 26, 2025, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/23/2025. (jls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
8 8 motion Stipulation Wed 01/22 1:35 PM
Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Pete's Meat Service, LLC. (Ackermann, Sara)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/22 1:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Timothy C. Blokhuis, LLC. (Ackermann, Sara)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 1:29 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nicole L. Stangl for Defendant Timothy C. Blokhuis, LLC. (Stangl, Nicole)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 1:25 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Sara J. Ackermann for Defendant Timothy C. Blokhuis, LLC. (Ackermann, Sara)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/02 8:26 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Timothy C. Blokhuis, LLC. (Fairweather, Nicholas) Modified on 12/2/2024. (lak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/27 1:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Timothy C. Blokhuis, LLC, filed by Vanessa M. Wiese. (Fairweather, Nicholas) Modified on 11/27/2024. (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/26 12:41 PM
Set Deadlines and Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/28/2025 at 9:00 AM by Zoom video conference. (arw)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 11/01 8:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Pete's Meat Service, LLC. (jef)
Related: [-]
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Fri 11/01 8:56 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor. (jef)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Fri 11/01 8:56 AM
Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (jef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Pete's Meat Service, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BWIWDC-3514902.), filed by Vanessa M. Wiese. (Fairweather, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dismissal and Notice of Rights,
Att: 2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons