Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Lee P Rudofsky
Case #: 4:24-cv-00940
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Case in other court:Pulaski County Circuit Court, 60CV-24-08301
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 3:18 AM CDT
Consol Plaintiff
Chanta Ringo
Represented By
Gary M. Klinger
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info
Jeff Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert
contact info
Christopher D. Jennings
Jennings & Earley PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Baptist Health
Represented By
Keeley Onna Cronin
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Christopher Wiech
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Adam D. Franks
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Keeley O. Cronin
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Graham Caughman Talley
Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Latanya Frazier
Represented By
Stephen Rauls
Sanford Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Leigh Skye Montgomery
Ellzey & Associates PLLC
contact info
Steve Rauls
Eksm, LLP
contact info
Sean Short
Sanford Law Firm, PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
PR; ordering all future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers shall be filed in the Frazier v. Baptist Health, Case No. 4:24-cv-00940-LPR; ordering that Plaintiffs' consolidated class action Complaint shall be filed within 30 days of the date of this order; and ordering Defendant to file an Answer to the consolidated class action Complaint within 45 days of the filing of the consolidated class action Complaint. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/31/2025. (ldb) Docket text modified on 3/31/2025 to correct typographical error. (kbc) ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' 18 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS, AND SET SCHEDULING DEADLINES; ordering that the above-captioned actions shall be consolidated for all purposes into the Frazier v. Baptist Health, Case No. 4:24-cv-00940-L

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
21 21 41 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/30 12:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand against Baptist Health, filed by Latanya Frazier, Chanta Ringo(Short, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
20 20 order Order Lifting Stay Mon 03/31 2:25 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER LIFTING STAY. Pursuant to19 Order. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/31/2025. (hml)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Mon 03/31 10:32 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS'18 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS, AND SET SCHEDULING DEADLINES; ordering that the above-captioned actions shall be consolidated for all purposes into the Frazier v. Baptist Health, Case No. 4:24-cv-00940-LPR; ordering all future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers shall be filed in the Frazier v. Baptist Health, Case No. 4:24-cv-00940-LPR; ordering that Plaintiffs' consolidated class action Complaint shall be filed within 30 days of the date of this order; and ordering Defendant to file an Answer to the consolidated class action Complaint within 45 days of the filing of the consolidated class action Complaint. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/31/2025. (ldb) Docket text modified on 3/31/2025 to correct typographical error. (kbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
utility Notice of Docket Correction Wed 03/26 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the proposed order was filed as an attachment to docket entry18 in error. (jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
18 18 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 03/25 3:32 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Latanya Frazier(Short, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 13, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 01/13 1:56 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting16 Unopposed Motion to Stay Case Proceedings. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/13/2025. (hml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
16 16 motion Stay Thu 01/09 5:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay re2 Complaint by Baptist Health (Cronin, Keeley)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/09 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Short on behalf of Latanya Frazier (Short, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/05 2:27 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting13 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to2 Complaint. Response due by 1/10/2025. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/5/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/05 1:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint by Baptist Health (Franks, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 3:46 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Leigh S. Montgomery. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 11/12/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Leigh S. Montgomery. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4853690. Filed by Latanya Frazier (Rauls, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/05 7:53 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Keeley O. Cronin. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 11/5/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/05 7:51 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher A. Wiech. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 11/5/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/04 3:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by KEELEY O. CRONIN. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4849399. Filed by Baptist Health (Franks, Adam)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/04 3:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by CHRISTOPHER A. WIECH. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4849388. Filed by Baptist Health (Franks, Adam)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/04 12:18 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to2 Complaint. Response due by 12/6/2024. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 11/4/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/04 10:04 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Baptist Health (Franks, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Thu 10/31 4:09 PM
ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 10/31 4:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Baptist Health. (ldb)
Related: [-]
2 2 34 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 4:07 PM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Latanya Frazier against Baptist Health. (ldb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 10/31 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Baptist Health from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV 24-8301 Fee $ 405, receipt number LIT8355. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet