California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:24-cv-07550
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Zachary Aaron Cardin
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Tracy Tarango
USCIS California Service Center USCIS California Service Center
2642 Michelle Drive, Tustin, CA 92780
Represented By
Zachary Aaron Cardin
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
5900 Capital Gateway Drive
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Zachary Aaron Cardin
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Murat Ergin
6350 CHRISTIE AVE APT 406
EMERYVILLE, CA 94608
Represented By
Dorukhan Korkut Oguz
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 23, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/23 7:14 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Murat Ergin (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/06 11:00 AM
NOTICE by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tracy Tarango Corrected Caption for Stay (Cardin, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/02 2:04 PM
ORDER re: 13 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. Case stayed until 4/10/2025. The court sets a Status Conference for 4/17/2025 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler to avoid losing track of the case. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2025. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/02/2025. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 01/02 7:05 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tracy Tarango. (Cardin, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 12/26 11:45 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tracy Tarango.. (Cardin, Zachary)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 12/26 9:24 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 1/9/2025 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 12/26 7:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Zachary Aaron Cardin on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tracy Tarango (Cardin, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 11/19 7:41 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Murat Ergin.. (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 11/18 2:26 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 12/2/2024 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 11:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Tracy Tarango, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Mon 11/04 11:17 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 10/31 2:05 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2024. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10/31 1:45 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Murat Ergin . (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 10/31 10:28 AM
Proposed Summons. (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10/31 10:06 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Murat Ergin . (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/31 9:50 AM
COMPLAINT Ergin against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20004248.). Filed by Murat Ergin. (Oguz, Dorukhan)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 10/31 10:41 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our most current version (10/2020) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Murat Ergin (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]