California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-02377
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Coastline Recovery Services, Inc.
Defendant
Westlake Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Paige James
Represented By
Russell S Thompson, IV
Thompson Consumer Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 01/23 6:37 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Paige James. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Thompson, Russell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 01/16 12:43 PM
(In Chambers) Order to Show Cause by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/23/2025. (vdr)
Related: [-]
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/16 12:39 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
11 11 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Mon 01/13 3:57 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge George H Wu. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge George H Wu to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:24-cv-02377 FMO(ADSx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
10 10 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Wed 01/08 12:33 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge George H Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:24-cv-02377-GW (ADSx). (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 01/08 10:57 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 01/08 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:24-cv-02377-JVS (ADSx). (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 11/18 9:29 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paige James, upon Defendant Westlake Services, LLC served on 11/8/2024, answer due 11/29/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tressa White, Corporate Creations Network Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Thompson, Russell)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/04 1:21 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Coastline Recovery Services, Inc., Westlake Services, LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 11/04 1:19 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV11C Statement of Consent
Thursday, October 31, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 10/31 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paige James, identifying None (other than the Parties). (Thompson, Russell)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 10/31 3:58 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Paige James. (Thompson, Russell)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 10/31 3:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paige James. (Thompson, Russell)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10/31 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38506086 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Paige James. (Attorney Russell S Thompson, IV added to party Paige James(pty:pla))(Thompson, Russell)
Related: [-]