California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-09448
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By
Karen T. Tsui
Maynard Nexsen LLP
contact info
Misty A. Murray
Maynard Nexsen LLP
contact info
Defendant
California Physicians Service
Represented By
Karen T. Tsui
Maynard Nexsen LLP
contact info
Misty A. Murray
Maynard Nexsen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Stephanie Blum Reuben
Represented By
Timothy D Reuben
Reuben Raucher And Blum
contact info
Stephen L. Raucher
Reuben Raucher And Blum
contact info
Maria Hutt
Reuben Raucher And Blum
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer D Reuben
Represented By
Timothy D Reuben
Reuben Raucher And Blum
contact info
Stephen L. Raucher
Reuben Raucher And Blum
contact info
Maria Hutt
Reuben Raucher And Blum
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Terminated: 11/14/2024
Defendant
Blue Cross of California
Terminated: 11/14/2024


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
38 38 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 05/15 11:03 AM
REPLY ---in support of -- NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modification of the Court's April 1, 2025 Order Setting Pretrial and Trial Schedule [ECF 29] --- ---Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order [ECF29] ---< 34 --- Defendants' Reply ISO Motion to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order --- filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service.(Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Misty A. Murray ISO Reply w_Exs A-C
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
37 37 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Wed 05/14 8:10 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Theodore Russell has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
36 36 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 05/09 12:52 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT30 appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing set for 05/15/25 is hereby vacated and the matter taken off calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
35 35 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 05/08 2:03 PM
PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION; DECLARATION OF MARIA HUTT, EX. A-D re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modification of the Court's April 1, 2025 Order Setting Pretrial and Trial Schedule [ECF 29] --- ---Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order [ECF29] ---< 34 filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Blum Reuben, Jennifer D Reuben. (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
34 34 20 pgs motion Order Thu 05/01 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Modification of the Court's April 1, 2025 Order Setting Pretrial and Trial Schedule [ECF 29] --- ---Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order [ECF29] --- filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service. Motion set for hearing on 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Hernan D. Vera. (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Karen T. Tsui,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
33 33 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 05/01 3:34 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF MARIA HUTT WITH EXHIBITS C - H 30 filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Blum Reuben, Jennifer D Reuben. (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
32 32 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 04/24 2:57 PM
Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF MARIA HUTT WITH EXHIBITS C - H 30 filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service.(Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Misty A. Murray ISO Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Leave to File FAC
Thursday, April 17, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Lodging Thu 04/17 6:10 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF MARIA HUTT WITH EXHIBITS C - H 30(Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redlined First Amended Complaint
30 30 motion Leave to File Document Thu 04/17 5:55 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF MARIA HUTT WITH EXHIBITS C - H filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Blum Reuben, Jennifer D Reuben. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Hernan D. Vera. (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
29 29 order Amended Minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/02 8:36 AM
CORRECTED MINUTES SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE held before Judge Hernan D. Vera. The Court held a Scheduling Conference with the parties on 04/01/25. Having considered the parties' proposed pre-trial and trial dates, the Court hereby sets the following schedule governing this case: Hearing on Motions In Limine 1/10/2026; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2026 10:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/17/2026 09:00 AM. For specific instructions on mandatory trial procedures, the Court refers counsel to the Court's Civil Trial Order. Please read that Order carefully as the procedures may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. [See order for other deadlines] Court Recorder: CourtSmart (lom) Modified on 4/2/2025 (lom)
Related: [-]
28 28 18 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 4:51 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (lom)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/01 4:42 PM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE held before Judge Hernan D. Vera. The Court held a Scheduling Conference with the parties on 04/01/25. Having considered the parties' proposed pre-trial and trial dates, the Court hereby sets the following schedule governing this case: Hearing on Motions In Limine 1/10/2026; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2026 10:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/17/2026 09:00 AM. For specific instructions on mandatory trial procedures, the Court refers counsel to the Court's Civil Trial Order. Please read that Order carefully as the procedures may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. [See order for other deadlines] Court Recorder: CourtSmart (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
26 26 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 03/18 1:56 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1/2 day, filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service.. (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 03/14 4:30 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen L. Raucher counsel for Plaintiffs Jennifer D Reuben, Stephanie Blum Reuben. Adding Stephen L. Raucher as counsel of record for Jennifer Reuben; Stephanie Blum Reuben for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Reuben; Stephanie Blum Reuben. (Attorney Stephen L. Raucher added to party Jennifer D Reuben(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen L. Raucher added to party Stephanie Blum Reuben(pty:pla))(Raucher, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
24 24 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/03 3:13 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT --- Defendants' Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement --- filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service identifying Aries Health, L.L.C. is the parent company of Blue Shield ---Ascendiun, Inc. is the parent company of Aries Health L.L.C --- as Corporate Parent. (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
23 23 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 01/30 9:14 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2025 at 10:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
22 22 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12/27 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service, (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/27 12:21 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT -- Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement --- filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service identifying Blue Shield of California is the parent company of Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company--- California Physicians Service dba Blue Shield of California is a not-for-profit corporation, has no parent corporation as Corporate Parent. (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/27 12:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 --- Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint --- filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service.(Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
19 19 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 12/26 11:33 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (wm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
18 18 18 pgs order Order Mon 12/23 3:36 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Fri 12/20 4:47 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-09448 HDV(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Thu 12/19 12:49 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-09448 CBM(MAAx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
15 15 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 12/18 4:35 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 11/15 1:11 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company answer now due 12/27/2024; California Physicians Service answer now due 12/27/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company; California Physicians Service.(Attorney Misty A. Murray added to party Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Misty A. Murray added to party California Physicians Service(pty:dft))(Murray, Misty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
13 13 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Thu 11/14 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Blum Reuben, Jennifer D Reuben pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 11/14 11:26 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephanie Blum Reuben, Jennifer D Reuben, upon Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company served on 11/8/2024, answer due 11/29/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro c/o CT Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 11/14 11:24 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephanie Blum Reuben, Jennifer D Reuben, upon Defendant Blue Cross of California served on 11/8/2024, answer due 11/29/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro c/o CT Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 11/14 11:21 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephanie Blum Reuben, Jennifer D Reuben, upon Defendant California Physicians Service served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Baines c/o Cogency Global Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 11/14 11:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephanie Blum Reuben, Jennifer D Reuben, upon Defendant Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Baines c/o Cogency Global Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11/05 11:39 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11/05 11:38 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Blue Shield of California Life and Health Insurance Company, California Physicians Service. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Tue 11/05 11:27 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (sh) (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/5/2024) CV-11C
Thursday, October 31, 2024
5 5 notice Summons Request Thu 10/31 6:33 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer D Reuben, Stephanie Blum Reuben. (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 10/31 6:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer D Reuben, Stephanie Blum Reuben. (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 10/31 6:28 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer D Reuben, Stephanie Blum Reuben, identifying Jennifer Reuben; Stephanie Blum Reuben; Blue Shield of California Life & Health Insurance Company; California Physicians Service d/b/a/ Blue Shield of California; Blue Cross of California d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross; Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 10/31 6:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer D Reuben, Stephanie Blum Reuben. (Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10/31 6:19 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38507498 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Stephanie Blum Reuben, Jennifer D Reuben. (Attorney Maria Hutt added to party Jennifer D Reuben(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Hutt added to party Stephanie Blum Reuben(pty:pla))(Hutt, Maria)
Related: [-]