Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00469
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 01, 2024 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Christian Harris (1)
Represented By
Starling Marshall McCallum
Law Office Of S Marshall Mccallum
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Linda Requenez-DOJ
Usdoj - U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/01/2024 3:18 AM CDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
3 3 MOTION FOR DETENTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE DETENTION HEARINGfiled by USA as to Christian Harris. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00921-BT]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford: Initial Appearance as to Christian Harris held on 10/4/2024. Date of Arrest: 10/1/2024. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Linda Requenez; Defense - Marshal McCallum. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00921-BT]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Christian Harris. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00921-BT]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Starling Marshall McCallum for Christian Harris appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/4/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00921-BT]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Christian Harris: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/4/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00921-BT]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Christian Harris. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00921-BT]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Christian Harris. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00921-BT]
Related: [-]
10 10 DETENTION ORDER as to Christian Harris (1). (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/4/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00921-BT]
Related: [-]
11 11 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/04/2024 as to Christian Harris. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00921-BT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
***DISREGARD ENTRY***CASE MERGED INTO 3:24-cr-469-E. Terminated merged defendant case, motions, and deadlines/hearings as to Christian Harris. (ykp)[3:24-mj-00921-BT] Modified on 10/30/2024 (ykp).
Related: [-]
12 12 INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Christian Harris (1) count(s) 1, 2. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (ykp)
Related: [-]
14 14 Government's NOTICE of Related Cases filed by USA as to Christian Harris (ykp)
Related: [-]