Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00241
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Terminated:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 01, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
PAUL PALGUTA (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brendan James McKenna
United States Attorney'S Office (pgh)
contact info
William Guappone
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/03/2024 12:18 PM EST
Thursday, October 31, 2024
1 1 9 pgs INFORMATION as to PAUL PALGUTA (1) count(s) 1, 2. (sms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Arraignment Plea,
Att: 2 1 pgs Waiver of Indictment,
Att: 3 2 pgs Criminal Case Info Sheet
2 2 4 pgs Information MEMORANDUM as to PAUL PALGUTA (sms)
Related: [-]