U.S. Court of Federal Claims
Judge:Richard A Hertling
Case #: 1:24-cv-01784
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1491 Tucker Act
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
USA
Represented By
Christopher Berridge
Doj-Civ
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
ACCENTURE FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
Aron Caraway Beezley
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TELESTO GROUP, LLC
Represented By
Hamish Hume
Boies Schiller & Flexner Llp (dc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/01/2024 8:20 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
1 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $405, Receipt number AUSFCC-9968207) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by TELESTO GROUP, LLC. Answer due by 12/30/2024. (aoc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, filed by TELESTO GROUP, LLC. Service: 10/31/2024. Response due by 11/13/2024. (aoc)
Related: [-]
3 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by TELESTO GROUP, LLC. Service: 10/31/2024. (aoc)
Related: [-]