Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:David L Bunning
Referred: P So
Case #: 0:24-cv-00104
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
10 10 respoth Response Mon 02/10 3:16 PM
"FINAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO HABEAS CORPUS PETITION" filed by Lennox L. Roper, Jr., pro se.(JLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 env, pm
utility File Submitted Mon 02/10 3:17 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:10 RESPONSE (JLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
utility File Submitted Thu 01/09 8:59 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review:9 Notice of Filing. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Wed 01/08 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF FILING by FCI Ashland re8 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,(Stone, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Eads Declaration
Monday, January 06, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/06 2:03 PM
ORDER: Within fourteen (14) days, the Respondent SHALL file:a. the notice of hearing before the Disciplinary Hearing Officer form, including the petitioners acknowledgement and elections of rights, and any supporting or related documents; b. any and all grievances or appeals filed by the petitionerregarding the disciplinary conviction at issue, as well as any andall of the Bureau of Prisons responses thereto, including acknowledgements of receipt, rejection notices, and substantive decisions. 2. On or before February 14, 2025, Roper SHALL file any reply in further support of his petition. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/6/25.(KSS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 respoth Response Brief Fri 01/03 2:15 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF to1 filed by FCI Ashland.(Stone, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Sutton Dec
utility File Submitted Fri 01/03 2:25 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:7 RESPONSE BRIEF (KSS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
6 6 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 11/15 12:40 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to U.S. Attorney re4 Order. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 misc Certified Mail Receipt Tue 11/12 3:54 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re4 Order to Warden, FCI Ashland (KSS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 11/04 3:42 PM
ORDER: 1) the clerk shall send a copy of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lennox L. Roper, Jr. via certified mail to the Respondent LeMaster and the U.S. Atty; 2) Respondent AHALL file a response w/i 60 days; 3) Respondent SHALL also file as attachments any documentary evidence as set out herein; 4) Roper SHALL file any reply w/i 28 days after Respondent files his response; 5) The briefing shall then be closed for review by the Court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/4/24.(JLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 notice Pro Se Information Packet Fri 11/01 1:25 PM
IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court.[LINK:Click here for more information on the rules.] It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail(JLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sample Caption
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 11/01 1:21 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 873.), filed by Lennox L. Roper, Jr., pro se.(JLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Receipt,
Att: 3 Request for Funds,
Att: 4 Env, no pm
misc Conflict Check Fri 11/01 1:22 PM
Conflict Check run. (JLS)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Fri 11/01 1:25 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (JLS)
Related: [-]