New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:24-cv-08326
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332t Diversity-Torts
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Allegis Group, Inc.
7301 Parkway Drive
Hanover, MD 21076
Represented By
Daniel Steven Goldstein
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
David James Doyle
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC
7320 Parkway Drive
Hanover, MD 21076
Represented By
Daniel Steven Goldstein
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
David James Doyle
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Mahn
Represented By
Rebecca Anne Brazzano
Brazzano Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
43 43 14 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 05/12 5:31 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re:25 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP . filed by Sharon Mahn. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motion to disqualify Defendants' counsel of record is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 25. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/12/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
42 42 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 03/27 4:04 PM
DECLARATION of Daniel S. Goldstein in Support re:31 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit K - February 10, 2025 Opinion and Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit L - February 6, 2025 Decision and Order
41 41 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 03/27 3:59 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:31 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
40 40 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/13 9:35 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:31 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
39 39 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 02/20 1:01 PM
ORDER For the reasons stated in this order, the pleading filed at Dkt. No. 35 is stricken. The deadline for Plaintiff to file opposition papers to Defendants' motion to dismiss the operative complaint, Dkt. No. 31, is extended by three weeks to March 13, 2025. Defendants' reply, if any, is due two weeks following service of Plaintiff's opposition. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Related [+] (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/20/2025) (jca)
Related: [-] sponses due by 3/13/2025
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
38 38 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Tue 02/18 11:54 AM
DECLARATION of Rebecca Brazzano in Support re:37 Response to Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Clean Copy of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ECF 35,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Blackline of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint
37 37 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 02/18 11:46 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:36 Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 02/18 3:14 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rebecca Anne Brazzano re: Document No. 35 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order granting permission to file the pleading was not attached; Court's leave has not been granted. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 02/14 2:59 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than February 21, 2025 why the Court should not deem her "Second Amended Complaint" to be ineffective. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/14/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
35 35 82 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/14 7:48 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending24 Amended Complaint,3 Complaint against Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sharon Mahn. Related document:24 Amended Complaint,3 Complaint..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - MLA Admissions in Motion to Dismiss Sankano Am. Compl.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - MLA Admissions in Reply MOL IFSO Motion to Dismiss Sankano Am. Compl.,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Defendants' Admissions in Motion Dismiss Saas Complaint
Thursday, January 30, 2025
34 34 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 01/30 5:37 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP . . Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
33 33 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 01/27 7:17 PM
DECLARATION of Daniel S. Goldstein in Support re:31 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Judge McMahon Decision and Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Partial Final Award,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Second Final Interim Award,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Final Opinion and Award,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Judgment,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Decision and order dated June 30, 2022,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Article,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Reply memo,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Adversary Proceeding Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Plaintiff's Am. Compl.
32 32 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 01/27 7:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:31 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Dismiss Mon 01/27 7:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
30 30 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/24 5:42 PM
DECLARATION of Daniel S. Goldstein in Opposition re:25 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP .. Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Final Opinion and Award,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Partial Final Award
29 29 18 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/24 5:39 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:25 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP . . Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
28 28 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Fri 01/10 6:10 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/19/2024 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Transcript Fri 01/10 6:09 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2024 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/31/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2025..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
26 26 8 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 01/10 4:35 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP . . Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Disqualify Counsel Fri 01/10 4:32 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP . Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
24 24 67 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/10 11:34 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending3 Complaint against Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sharon Mahn. Related document:3 Complaint..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A MLA Motion to Dismiss Sankano Am. Compl.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B MLA Reply MOL IFSO Motion to Dismiss Sankano Am. Compl.,
Att: 3 Exhibit C MLA Motion to Dismiss Saas Complaint
Friday, December 20, 2024
23 23 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 12/20 12:14 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:22 Letter, filed by Sharon Mahn. Application granted. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's December 19, 2024 request for an extension of time to amend the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A), Dkt. No. 22, is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A) is extended to January 10, 2025. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) (1)(A). All other deadlines in this case remaining full force and effect. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2025.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/20/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Thu 12/19 8:57 PM
AMENDED LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Rebecca Brazzano dated December 19, 2024 re: Supplemental Letter Regarding Right to Amend the Complaint and Letter Request to Extend Plaintiffs Time to File the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Letter Thu 12/19 8:34 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Rebecca Brazzano dated December 19, 2024 re: Supplemental Letter Regarding Right to Amend the Complaint and Letter Request to Extend Plaintiffs Time to File the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 12/19 4:26 PM
ORDER: First, Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to January 27, 2025. The deadline is extended because the Court understands that Plaintiff intends to amend the complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). Second, the deadline for Plaintiff to submit any supplemental letter regarding her right to amend the complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1) is December 20, 2024, at 5:00 p.m. Third, Plaintiff's motion to disqualify attorneys David James Doyle and Daniel Steven Goldstein and the law firm Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP as counsel for Defendants is due by January 10, 2025. Defendants' opposition is due two weeks after the date of service of Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due one week after the date of service of Defendants' opposition. SO ORDERED. Allegis Group, Inc. answer due 1/27/2025; Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC answer due 1/27/2025.( Motions due by 1/10/2025.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/19/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 12/19 3:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024. Service was accepted by CSC-LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE COMPANY. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 12/26 3:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 12/19/2024. (Court Reporter Present) (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Tue 12/17 4:45 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Rebecca Brazzano dated December 17, 2024 re: Pre-Motion Letter Seeking Permission to File a Motion to Disqualify Counsel of Record for Defendants. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Mon 12/16 6:01 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Rebecca Brazzano dated December 16, 2024 re: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Request to File a Motion to Dismiss and the Court Order Docket No. 16. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Thu 12/12 6:59 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference is granted. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss on December 19, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Individual Rules. In light of the pre-motion conference, the initial pre-trial conference scheduled in this case for January 7, 2025, and the corresponding deadline to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan, are both adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 15. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/12/2024) Telephone Conference set for 12/19/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (ks)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Conference Thu 12/12 4:27 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re:3 Complaint,4 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference,, / Request Pre-Motion Conference for Motion to Dismiss & Adjourn Initial Pretrial Conference and Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from David J. Doyle dated December 12, 2024. Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Doyle, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/09 12:36 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for David J. Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/06 2:20 PM
MOTION for David J. Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30291753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit / Declaration of David J. Doyle,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/06 1:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MLA Legal, LLC, Corporate Parent MLA Holdings, LLC for Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC. Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/06 1:51 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allegis Group Holdings, Inc. for Allegis Group, Inc.. Document filed by Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 1:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Steven Goldstein on behalf of Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC..(Goldstein, Daniel)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 12/06 3:22 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 13 MOTION for David J. Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30291753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 3:25 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC. (sj)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 11/25 1:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC, re:3 Complaint. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 11/25 12:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Allegis Group, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024. Service was accepted by CSC-LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE COMPANY. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 3:05 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allegis Group, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 11/05 12:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allegis Group, Inc., re:3 Complaint. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 11/04 6:12 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be held by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Individual Rules. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/4/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 11/04 11:08 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 11/04 11:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 11/04 11:09 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 11/04 11:09 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rebecca Anne Brazzano. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $25,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $25,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 54 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC. Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/01 1:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brazzano, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 54 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 1:49 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Allegis Group, Inc., Major, Lindsey & Africa, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-30129630)Document filed by Sharon Mahn..(Brazzano, Rebecca) Modified on 11/1/2024 (pc)
Related: [-]