New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:24-cv-08327
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Terminated:Dec 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
The Roomplace Furniture and Mattress, LLC
Plaintiff
Erika Alexandria
Represented By
Rami Salim
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 12/24 6:55 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) The Roomplace Furniture and Mattress, LLC. Document filed by Erika Alexandria. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/19 1:27 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Roomplace Furniture and Mattress, LLC served on 11/12/2024, answer due 12/3/2024. Service was accepted by Dean Timm. Document filed by Erika Alexandria..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 11/07 9:35 AM
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/4/2025 at 12:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on February 4, 2025 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Members of the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. So Ordered (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/7/2024) (ar)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 3:23 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Roomplace Furniture and Mattress, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 11/04 9:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 11/04 9:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 11/04 9:55 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 11/01 1:43 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE ROOMPLACE FURNITURE AND MATTRESS, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Erika Alexandria..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/01 1:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT against The Roomplace Furniture and Mattress, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30129654)Document filed by Erika Alexandria..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]