New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Diane Gujarati
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:24-cv-07669
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Andrew Merola, MD
Represented By
Morris J. Fodeman
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati PC
contact info
Alexander Luhring
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati P.C.
contact info
Jessica Lonergan
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Plaintiff
Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Olivia Taylor Knott
The Willis Law Group
contact info
William Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info
Aaron Eitan Meyer
The Willis Law Group
contact info
Michael A Graves
The Willis Law Group, PLLC
contact info
William J. Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Thu 04/24 5:02 PM
Letter [Initial Conference Request] by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Clay, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
24 24 17 pgs respoth Reply in Support Wed 04/23 3:24 PM
REPLY in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrew Merola, MD. (Fodeman, Morris)
Related: [-]
23 23 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Wed 04/23 3:23 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrew Merola, MD. (Fodeman, Morris)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 04/23 3:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [DECLARATION OF ANDREW MEROLA, M.D.] filed by Andrew Merola, MD. (Fodeman, Morris)
Related: [-]
21 21 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 04/23 3:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Andrew Merola, MD. (Fodeman, Morris)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/23 3:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Andrew Merola, MD. (Fodeman, Morris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
19 19 misc Letter Wed 04/09 4:41 PM
Letter [SERVICE LETTER] regarding service of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Clay, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
18 18 misc Letter Mon 03/10 9:41 PM
Letter [Letter pursuant to the Court's Individual Rule III(B)(4) in connection with service of Defendant Andrew Merola, MD's Motion to Dismiss] by Andrew Merola, MD (Fodeman, Morris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
order Order(Other) Wed 02/12 10:15 AM
ORDER granting17 Letter to the Honorable Diane Gujarati regarding joint motion to dismiss briefing schedule in connection with First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 16) -- The proposed briefing schedule is adopted. Defendant shall serve his motion to dismiss on Plaintiff by March 10, 2025; Plaintiff shall serve its response on Defendant by April 9, 2025; and Defendant shall serve his reply, if any, on Plaintiff by April 23, 2025, at which point Defendant shall file the fully-briefed motion on ECF in accordance with Individual Practice Rule III.B.4. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 2/12/2025. (MAR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 02/11 10:53 AM
Letter to the Honorable Diane Gujarati regarding joint motion to dismiss briefing schedule in connection with First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 16) by Andrew Merola, MD (Fodeman, Morris)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
16 16 25 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/07 4:15 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT [FIRST] against Andrew Merola, MD, filed by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Clay, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
minutes Pre Motion Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 01/24 3:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gujarati: Pre-Motion Conference held on January 24, 2025. William J. Clay, Michael A. Graves, and Olivia Taylor Knott appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Morris J. Fodeman, Jessica Lonergan, and Alexander Luhring appeared on behalf of Defendant. Case called. Discussion held regarding Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss. As set forth on the record: (1) Plaintiff sought leave to amend the Complaint; (2) the Court granted Plaintiff leave to amend and set a deadline of February 7, 2025 for the filing of any Amended Complaint; and (3) the Court directed the parties to meet and confer before the filing of any Amended Complaint. (Court Reporter Michele Lucchese.) (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/23 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Luhring on behalf of Andrew Merola, MD (aty to be noticed) (Luhring, Alexander)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/23 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lonergan on behalf of Andrew Merola, MD (aty to be noticed) (Lonergan, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Fri 01/17 2:37 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference -- A pre-motion conference on Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss will be held on January 24, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4B South before Judge Diane Gujarati. Counsel shall appear 15 minutes prior to the conference and shall check in with the courtroom deputy. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 1/17/2025. (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Graves on behalf of Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Graves, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 misc Letter Wed 01/15 5:49 PM
Letter Motion - Supplemental Response to ECF No. 10 per 1/14/25 Order by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Clay, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
order Order(Other) Tue 01/14 12:28 PM
ORDER re10 -- By January 15, 2025, Plaintiff shall supplement the Response at ECF No. 10 to indicate whether Plaintiff will seek leave to amend and, if so, shall set forth the nature of any contemplated amendment. See Individual Practice Rule III.A.3. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 1/14/2025. (AD)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/06 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Eitan Meyer on behalf of Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Meyer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 01/06 10:41 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Clay, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
9 9 3 pgs motion Pre Motion Conference Mon 12/30 5:14 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Andrew Merola, MD. (Fodeman, Morris)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Thu 12/26 12:45 PM
Letter William Clay Vacation Letter to Court by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Clay, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/21 2:05 PM
ORDER granting7 consent motion for extension of time to file answer. Defendant Dr. Merola shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 by 12/31/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 11/21/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/19 4:24 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Andrew Merola, MD. (Fodeman, Morris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit / STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/06 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Taylor Knott on behalf of Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Knott, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/05 9:09 AM
ORDER granting2 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 11/5/2024. (MED)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 11/01 3:59 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 11/01 3:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Andrew Merola, MD. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 11/01 3:57 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/01 3:57 PM
Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice WILLIAM J. CLAY Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18454304 by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Clay, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT ORIGINAL against Andrew Merola, MD filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18454195 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Clay, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 11/01 3:56 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]