Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul Baisier
Case #: 1:24-bk-61674
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Dismissed:Dec 17, 2024
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025

Debtor
Families Uplifting Families Inc.
#1608 2479 Peachtree Rd
Atlanta, GA 30305
Represented By
Families Uplifting Families Inc.
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 05, 2024 1:47 AM EST
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Federal Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Letter Re: Outstanding Filing Fee Fri 02/21 1:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Letter to Debtor Regarding Outstanding Filing Fee Notice Date 02/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 15, 2025
12 12 misc Letter to Debtor re: Unpaid Filing Fees Sat 02/15 6:45 AM
Letter to Debtor Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed Fri 01/31 12:41 PM
Case Closed (cws)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case (403) Fri 12/20 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Notice Date 12/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
10 10 order Dismiss Case, Motion to Tue 12/17 1:11 PM
ORDERED that the United States Trustee's Motion is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 12/17/2024. (cws)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors Fri 11/08 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 11/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Thu 11/07 12:55 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual Thu 11/07 12:55 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 11/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/06 6:21 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Daniel E. Melchi on behalf of Parklane on Peachtree Condominium Association, Inc.. (Melchi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 motion 05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER) Tue 11/05 11:51 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Adriano Omar Iqbal on behalf of United States Trustee. Hearing to be held on 12/2/2024 at 01:20 PM in Courtroom 1202, Atlanta. (Iqbal, Adriano)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Tue 11/05 10:08 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 12/6/2024 at 02:00 PM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (jwc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees Mon 11/04 3:12 PM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 11/4/2024. Related [+] (jwc)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual) Mon 11/04 3:06 PM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/15/2024. Schedule(s) A/B, C, D, E/F, G, H due by 11/15/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 11/15/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 11/15/2024. Corporate Resolution due 11/15/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 11/15/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 11/15/2024. Tax Return Date: 11/8/2024. Balance Sheet Date: 11/8/2024.Statement of Operations Due 11/8/2024Cash Flow Statement due 11/8/2024 (jwc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
1 1 misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 11/01 3:58 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by Families Uplifting Families Inc. . Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 4/30/2025., Disclosure Statement due by 4/30/2025. (rfs)
Related: [-]