California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Sheila K Oberto
Case #: 1:24-cv-01343
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Case in other court:County of Tulare, VCU313464
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 2:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Bluescope Buildings North America, Inc.
Represented By
Michelle Ann Clark
Alston & Bird
contact info
Ryan L Eddings
Littler Mendelson (fresno)
contact info
Zoe Y. Monty-Montalvo
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Carolyn G Hudson
Littler
contact info
Plaintiff
Johana Valdivia
Represented By
Robert Meehan
Limonjyan Law Group Apc
contact info
Ruben Limonjyan
Limonjyan Law Group, Apc
contact info
Zara Arakelyan, NCAED
Limonjyan Law Group, Apc
contact info
Geoffrey Dickhaut
Limonjyan Law Group, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/08 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Michelle A. Clark by Bluescope Buildings North America, Inc..(Hudson, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/18 4:14 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ryan L Eddings on behalf of Bluescope Buildings North America, Inc.. Attorney Eddings, Ryan L added. (Eddings, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
10 10 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/05 4:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/5/2025:.Non Expert Discovery due by 11/11/2025. Expert Disclosures due by 12/1/2025. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 1/28/2026. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/9/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2026 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2026 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Deputy Clerk WAK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/30 10:53 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Robert Meehan on behalf of Johana Valdivia. (Limonjyan, Ruben) Modified on 1/30/2025 (WAK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 order Minute Order Wed 01/29 4:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/29/2025: (Text Only Entry). *** **NOTE NEW CALL IN NUMBER** The parties are GRANTED permission to appear telephonically for the upcoming Scheduling Conference set on 2/4/2025 before Judge Oberto by dialing 669-254-5252; Meeting ID 160 801 1115; passcode 449390, at the time of the hearing. You shall email Courtroom Deputy Wendy Kusamura, at WKusamura@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court who will be appearing telephonically. (Deputy Clerk WAK)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Status Report Wed 01/29 4:16 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bluescope Buildings North America, Inc.. (Hudson, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 01/06 2:13 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral.(Hudson, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, November 01, 2024
5 5 misc Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction Fri 11/01 2:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Directing Attorney, Zara Arakelyan, NCAED to Submit Petition for Admission to Practice in Eastern District of California. Please visit PACER.gov for admission. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for JLT Fri 11/01 2:01 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
3 3 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 11/01 1:50 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Bluescope Buildings North America, Inc. re2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal,. (Hudson, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/01 1:31 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Bluescope Buildings North America, Inc.. (Hudson, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 11/01 1:30 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare, case number VCU313464 by JOHANA VALDIVIA. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11847928) (Hudson, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Carolyn G. Hudson,
Att: 3 Declaration of Elizabeth Tobin
service Service by Mail Fri 11/01 2:04 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice,4 Civil New Case Documents for JLT served on Zara Arakelyan NCAED. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]