Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Gregory F Vantatenhove
Referred: Edward B Atkins
Case #: 3:24-cv-00067
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
World Class Distribution Inc.
Represented By
Sophia Nicole Wilson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp - Ky
contact info
Denise Michelle Motta
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp - Ky
contact info
Plaintiff
Byron Robey
Represented By
Elizabeth Gatten
Biesecker, Dutkanych & Macer - Louisville
contact info
Andrew Dutkanych, III
Biesecker, Dutkanych & Macer, Llc-Indiana
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order Deadline Thu 02/20 11:19 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/15/2026. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2025. Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 6/30/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2026. Pretrial Filings due by 9/7/2026. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 9/21/2026 at 1:30 PM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. Expert Witness List due by 4/15/2026. JURY TRIAL set for 10/5/2026 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove, counsel by 9:30 a.m. (3 days). Requests to modify any dates or deadlines established by this order shall be submitted upon motion filed prior to expiration of the deadline in question, and upon showing of good cause beyond the control of counsel in the exercise of due diligence. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to a Magistrate Judge for the purpose of supervising discovery and pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 2/20/2025.(JJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
14 14 notice Other Notice Thu 02/13 3:01 PM
NOTICE by World Class Distribution Inc. re13 Disclosures of Service (Wilson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Disclosures Thu 02/13 2:57 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURES by World Class Distribution Inc..(Wilson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 02/12 3:03 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wilson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Wed 02/12 4:14 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review:12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
11 11 3 pgs order Order For Meeting and Report Fri 01/17 2:20 PM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: NLT 30 days, parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). 2. At the meeting, parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). 3. NLT 10 days after the meeting, parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. This report shall conform to former Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Appendix Form 52 . 4. In the event this matter involves a corporation or partnership, the party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the parties' joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 1/17/2025.(JJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to a Magistrate Form
Monday, December 09, 2024
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Mon 12/09 4:28 PM
CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by World Class Distribution Inc.. (Wilson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 respoth Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by World Class Distribution Inc.. (Motta, Denise)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/27 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Gatten on behalf of Byron Robey (Gatten, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 11/26 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Sophia Wilson.6 Answer to Complaint has been filed by World Class Distribution Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/26 11:21 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by World Class Distribution Inc..(Wilson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Tue 11/26 11:29 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review:1 Complaint,6 Answer to Complaint (JJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Fri 11/08 5:50 PM
Summons Returned Executed by Byron Robey as to World Class Distribution Inc. served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued/Reissued Fri 11/01 2:53 PM
Summons Issued as to World Class Distribution Inc. and returned to counsel electronically for service. (CBD)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of Byron Robey (CBD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5961736), filed by Byron Robey.(CBD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
misc Conflict Check Fri 11/01 2:15 PM
Conflict Check run. (CBD)
Related: [-]