Washington Western District Court
Judge:Jamal N Whitehead
Case #: 2:24-cv-01810
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 23-00002-24332-3
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 3:00 AM PDT
Defendant
United Services Automobile Association
Represented By
Daniel L Syhre
Forsberg & Umlauf (sea)
contact info
Kimberly Reppart
Forsberg & Umlauf (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron McNelly
Represented By
Joseph P Loughlin
Loughlin Law Firm PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Crawford & Company
Terminated: 11/05/2024
Represented By
Megan Maria Coluccio
Baker Sterchi Cowden & Rice LLC
contact info
John Barry
Baker Sterchi Cowden & Rice LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Laviletta
Terminated: 11/05/2024
Represented By
Megan Maria Coluccio
Baker Sterchi Cowden & Rice LLC
contact info
John Barry
Baker Sterchi Cowden & Rice LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, January 23, 2025
10 10 order JNW Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates Thu 01/23 9:02 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Jamal N Whitehead. Length of Trial: 6-7 Days. Jury Trial is set for 4/13/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Jamal N Whitehead. Joinder of Parties due by 3/24/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/15/2025, Discovery Motions due by 10/15/2025, Discovery completed by 11/14/2025, Dispositive motions due by 12/15/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 2/12/2026, Motions in Limine due by 3/4/2026, Deposition Designations due by 3/23/2026, Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2026, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/30/2026, Proposed voir dire questions due by 3/30/2026, Proposed jury instructions due by 3/30/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2026 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 16106 before Judge Jamal N Whitehead. (GC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
9 9 misc Joint Status Report Tue 01/21 4:05 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Syhre, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
8 8 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Tue 12/10 1:54 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/31/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/14/2025, Joint Status Report due by 1/21/2025. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead. (GC)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
misc Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry) Fri 11/08 12:18 PM
Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company has been updated to United Services Automobile Association per state court order included in Dkt6 Verification of State Court Records. (CDA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Parties Tue 11/05 11:19 AM
Parties Crawford & Company and Jeffrey Laviletta terminated per Order of Dismissal of parties in State Court prior to removal filed at Exhibit 2 to2 Declaration of Daniel L. Syhre. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
7 7 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Mon 11/04 10:22 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/04 10:18 AM
Judge Jamal N Whitehead added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
6 6 misc Verification of State Court Records Fri 11/01 3:45 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company(Syhre, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
5 5 notice Notice-Other Fri 11/01 3:43 PM
NOTICE to Plaintiff re2 Declaration (non motion),3 Jury Demand,4 Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Syhre, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 11/01 3:41 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association, Corporate Parent USAA General Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent USAA, Corporate Parent USAA GIC for USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Syhre, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Jury Demand Fri 11/01 3:38 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Syhre, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Fri 11/01 3:29 PM
DECLARATION of Daniel L. Syhre re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Syhre, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 11/01 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 23 2-24332 3 KNT; Related [+] filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Syhre, Daniel)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8701912
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Complaint