Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 0:24-cv-62056
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Terminated:Nov 22, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 10 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 11/25 7:50 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 11/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
11 11 respm Response/Reply (Other) Wed 11/20 6:24 PM
RESPONSE to1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by U.S. Marshal for the Southern District of Florida, United States Attorney General, United States Secretary of State.(Plechac-Diaz, Felipe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Detention Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Committal Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Victim's Statement,
Att: 4 Exhibit U.S. Ireland Treaty
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 11/06 9:24 AM
ORDER granting in part8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner's Application no later than November 20, 2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 11/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (jao)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/06 7:42 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by Kevin Yungman. Replies due by 11/13/2024. (Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 11/05 4:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by U.S. Marshal for the Southern District of Florida, United States Attorney General, United States Secretary of State.(Plechac-Diaz, Felipe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/05 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Felipe Plechac-Diaz on behalf of U.S. Marshal for the Southern District of Florida, United States Attorney General, United States Secretary of State. Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party U.S. Marshal for the Southern District of Florida(pty:dft), Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party United States Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz added to party United States Secretary of State(pty:dft). (Plechac-Diaz, Felipe)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Expedited Motion Tue 11/05 7:28 AM
ORDER granting5 Expedited Motion for an Expedited Ruling and/or Status Conference. Responses due by 11/14/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 11/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Expedited Motion Mon 11/04 9:57 AM
Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION For an Expedited Ruling and / or Status Conference by Kevin Yungman. (Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 11/01 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joseph O'Donnell on behalf of Kevin Yungman. Attorney Edward Joseph O'Donnell added to party Kevin Yungman(pty:pla). (O'Donnell, Edward)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 11/01 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexa K. Klein on behalf of Kevin Yungman. Attorney Alexa K. Klein added to party Kevin Yungman(pty:pla). (Klein, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 11/01 11:58 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. (jc)
Related: [-]
1 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17951681, filed by Kevin Yungman.(Srebnick, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet