Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:24-cv-05007
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Terminated:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:36 AM EDT
Plaintiff
Judith Marie Thomas
Represented By
Octavio Gomez
The Consumer Lawyers PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 12/30/2024
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Terminated: 01/28/2025
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Terminated: 12/30/2024


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 01/29 9:12 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (gww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 01/28 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Judith Marie Thomas (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 01/15 1:47 PM
ORDER: In light of the pending settlement, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for docket management purposes. The parties are ORDERED to file the appropriate documents to dispose of the case within sixty days. Absent an extension or further order of the Court, if no request to reopen the case is made within sixty days, the Court may dismiss the case with prejudice. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/15 1:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker terminated from case. (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 01/13 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Judith Marie Thomas (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 12/31 9:08 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/30 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Equifax Information Services LLC and Trans Union LLC filed by Judith Marie Thomas (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 12/05 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union LLC by Judith Marie Thomas (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 11/26 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services LLC by Judith Marie Thomas (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Wed 11/20 3:31 PM
Return of Service Executed by Judith Marie Thomas. Trans Union LLC served on 11/15/2024, answer due 12/6/2024. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/20 2:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Judith Marie Thomas. Experian Information Solutions, Inc waiver mailed on 11/14/2024, answer due 1/13/2025. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 11/19 1:27 PM
Clerk's Notation re5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/07 10:38 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Judith Marie Thomas. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 11/01 12:50 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (djs)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 11/01 12:49 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. (djs)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 11/01 12:49 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (djs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13836083) filed by Judith Marie Thomas.(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet