Texas Western District Court
Judge:Jason K Pulliam
Referred: Richard B Farrer
Case #: 5:24-mc-01248
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Terminated:Dec 17, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 12/17 1:36 PM
ORDER CANCELLING MOTION HEARING (ZOOM) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above entitled and numbered case having been set for MOTION HEARING (ZOOM) on Thursday, December 19, 2024 at 01:00 PM is hereby CANCELLED. re4 Order, Set Motion Hearings. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion to Quash Tue 12/17 9:43 AM
Text Order MOOTING1 Motion for Protective Order; MOOTING1 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. Based on the parties' representations in their Joint Advisory5 , filed December 16, 2024, the relief sought in Movant's Motion1 is now MOOT. Consequently, the hearing on the motion scheduled for December 19, 2024, at 1:00 P.M. is CANCELED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 02/14 12:40 PM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (vl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
5 5 misc Advisory to the Court Mon 12/16 11:45 AM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Maurice L. Burns, Crete Carrier Corporation filed jointly with PSN Affiliates, LLC . (Altman, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion Hearings Tue 12/10 8:48 AM
ORDER RE-SET HEARING re1 MOTION for Confidentiality/Protective Order MOTION to Quash filed by PSN Affiliates, LLC, ( Motion Hearing Via Zoom Re-set for 12/19/2024 01:00 PM in San Antonio before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 12/06 9:40 AM
ORDER re1 MOTION for Confidentiality/Protective Order MOTION to Quash filed by PSN Affiliates, LLC, ( Miscellaneous Hearing set Via Zoom for 12/19/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall meaningfully confer either via video conference or by telephone about the issues raised in the motion, and they shall then jointly file an advisory by noon on December 16, 2024. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion to Quash Fri 11/08 10:31 AM
Text Order TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT1 Movant's Motion for Protective Order & Motion to Quash entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. Compliance with the discovery requests described in the Motion is STAYED pending the Court's consideration of the matter. Once the matter is ripe, the Court will set it for a hearing. The hearing may be held remotely by Zoom if the Court deems it appropriate. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
2 2 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 11/05 10:00 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
1 1 motion Protective Order Quash Fri 11/01 12:01 PM
MOTION for Protective Order of Movant PSN Affiliates, LLC D/B/A Legent Hospital of El Paso and MOTION to Quash.(tt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt