Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Myron H Thompson
Case #: 2:24-cv-00695
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 4:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Louise M. Davis
2007 Red Goodson Lane
Prattvilee, AL 36067
Defendant
Davis Funeral Home, LLC
362 Walnut Street
Prattville, AL 36068
Defendant
Kimberly Ford
Represented By
Jim Tom Norman, III
Law Offices Of Jim T. Norman, Iii, LLC
contact info
Defendant
William Ford
Represented By
Calvin James Whaley
Cherry & Irwin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Napoleon Goodson, III
Represented By
Jim Tom Norman, III
Law Offices Of Jim T. Norman, Iii, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
William Evans Brittain
Ball Ball Matthews & Novak PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
19 19 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 02/11 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Clerk's Dismissal this case is closed with prejudice without an order of the court. Signed by Trey Granger, Clerk of Court on 2/11/2025. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
18 18 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/10 3:05 PM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate. Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case as Presider. (LAB)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/10 9:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Brittain, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Deadline Tue 01/07 4:01 PM
ORDER: Upon consideration of the Notice of Settlement and Motion to Extend All Deadlines (Doc. 15 ), filed by Plaintiff Country Mutual Insurance Company, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED to the extent that all pending deadlines are continued 30 days. It is further ORDERED that, the Court having been informed that the claims pending in this action are resolved, the parties must file a joint stipulation of dismissal comporting with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by January 21, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/7/2025. (SCN)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/06 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Country Mutual Insurance Company (Brittain, William) Modified on 1/6/2025 to clarify text (AM)
Related: [-]
motion Extension of Deadline Mon 01/06 1:09 PM
MOTION to Extend all Deadlines, by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (See doc15 ) (AM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/02 3:25 PM
ORDER: by January 9, 2025, Defendants must file compliant conflict disclosure statements, as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/2/2025. (SCN)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/20 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Form to Decline Consent to the U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Country Mutual Insurance Company, William Ford. Declination of Consent to Magistrate Judge due by 1/10/2025.(SCN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 General Order
12 12 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/20 3:26 PM
ORDER: To ensure the parties are apprised of the new policies and procedures, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to provide both parties with the recently revised Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge, as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 12/20/2024. (SCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/20 9:10 AM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by William Ford. (Whaley, Calvin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/11 9:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. Davis Funeral Home, LLC served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (Brittain, William)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/11 9:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. Louise M. Davis served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (Brittain, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/08 2:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. Kimberly Ford waiver sent on 11/8/2024, answer due 1/7/2025; Napoleon Goodson, III waiver sent on 11/8/2024, answer due 1/7/2025. (Brittain, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/08 2:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. William Ford waiver sent on 11/8/2024, answer due 1/7/2025. (Brittain, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 11:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Louise M. Davis, Davis Funeral Home, LLC, Kimberly Ford, William Ford, and Napoleon Goodson, III. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (GGN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/04 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Country Mutual Insurance Company. (GGN)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/04 9:09 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate, as presiding judge. (GGN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 service Proposed Summons Fri 11/01 3:45 PM
Proposed Summons (Brittain, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Fri 11/01 3:34 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Brittain, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND for Declaratory Judgment against Napoleon Goodson II, William Ford, Kimberly Ford, Davis Funeral Home, LLC, and Louise Davis (filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3737676.), filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/30/2025. (Brittain, William) Modified on 11/1/2024 to add jury demand and list each defendant (GGN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3