New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 2:24-cv-10249
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 6:01 AM EDT
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
Defendant
UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE CO.
Defendant
UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC.
Defendant
UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Defendant
OPTUMRX,INC
Defendant
OPTUMINSIGHT, INC.
Defendant
OPTUM, INC.
Defendant
CAREMARK LLC
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC.
Defendant
ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE, INC.
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY, INC
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Defendant
CAREMARK RX, LLC
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
Plaintiff
WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA SCHOOLS HEALTH CARE CONSORTIUM, INC.
Represented By
WILLIAM B. SHINOFF
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Friday, December 13, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/13 1:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA SCHOOLS HEALTH CARE CONSORTIUM, INC.. All Defendants.(SHINOFF, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service,
Att: 9 Certificate of Service,
Att: 10 Certificate of Service,
Att: 11 Certificate of Service,
Att: 12 Certificate of Service,
Att: 13 Certificate of Service,
Att: 14 Certificate of Service,
Att: 15 Certificate of Service,
Att: 16 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 04, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 11/04 10:29 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAREMARK LLC, CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC, CAREMARK RX, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE, INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUM, INC., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., OPTUMRX,INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/04 10:28 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, )
Related: [-]
order Case Management Order Mon 11/04 10:30 AM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (krg, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Mon 11/04 10:31 AM
Member Case Direct File on 11/1/2024, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
1 1 198 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/01 7:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15781444) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA SCHOOLS HEALTH CARE CONSORTIUM, INC..(SHINOFF, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet