Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-07589
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 12:31 AM MST
Defendant
Austin Yoo (1)
Represented By
Timothy Davis Rogers
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan DeJoe
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/04/2024 1:54 AM MST
Friday, October 04, 2024
Arrest of Austin Yoo on 10/4/2024. (JAM) [4:24-mj-02685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Austin Yoo. (JAM) [4:24-mj-02685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau: Initial Appearance as to Austin Yoo held on 10/7/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Timothy Davis Rogers for Austin Yoo with Appointment Type: FPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant(s) temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Interpreter N/A English. Argument for release is denied. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Christopher Curran, duty for the Government, AFPD Annamarie Valdivia, duty for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 10/9/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/9/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri. Related [+] Hearing held 2:40 pm to 4:15 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau.(BHA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:24-mj-02685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Austin Yoo. (BHA) [4:24-mj-02685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Preliminary Hearing as to Austin Yoo waived on 10/9/2024. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Detention Hearing held. Without objection, the Court adopts the recommendation made by Pretrial Services and orders defendant released. Defendant advised of conditions of release on the record. Appearances : AUSA Gordon Davenport, AUSA on duty for the Government, AFPD Tim Rogers for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 10:38 AM to 11:13 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) [4:24-mj-02685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Austin Yoo. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 10/9/2024. (SIB) [4:24-mj-02685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
9 9 NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Austin Yoo. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (JAG) [4:24-mj-02685-N/A-MAA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
11 11 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Austin Yoo (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6. Arraignment set for 11/22/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. Counsel to advise defendants wishing to waive their appearance at the Arraignment Hearing of the following proposed dates: Trial: 12/31/2024; Plea Deadline: 12/13/2024. NOTE: The process for waiving defendant's appearance at Arraignment has changed. There is no longer a need to file a Notice of Intent to File Waiver of Defendants Appearance. Instead, signed appearance waivers may be electronically filed using the Waiver of Defendants Presence at Arraignment and Acknowledgement of Trial Date event. The event is located under Criminal Event Categories: Other Filings/Waivers. The signed Waiver must be filed no later than 12:00 PM the business day prior to the scheduled arraignment. Failure of defense counsel to file a timely waiver (or a timely motion to continue) may result in the reappointment of defense counsel. (MCO)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
13 13 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Austin Yoo. (DLC)
Related: [-]