Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-01206
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 12:44 AM MST
Defendant
Victor Otoniel Colop-Lopez (1)
Represented By
Isabel Michela Amsel
Law Office Of Isabel Michela Amsel PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/04/2024 2:17 AM MST
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
Arrest of Victor Otoniel Colop-Lopez on 10/29/2024. (CMB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Victor Otoniel Colop-Lopez. (CMB)
Related: [-]