North Dakota District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00182
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 2:21 AM CDT
Defendant
Dumarea Demon Brown (1)
Represented By
Max A. Rudy
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Corry Darnell Carrigan (2)
Represented By
Katie L Winbauer
Bormann, Myerchin, Espeseth & Edison, LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Schultz
Eaton & Ward Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Robert Leon Johnson, III (3)
Represented By
Alexis Madlom
Vickers Law
contact info
Defendant
Robert Leon Johnson, Jr. (4)
Represented By
Trent Neil Barkus
Barkus Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rick L. Volk
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/02/2024 3:38 AM CDT
Friday, October 18, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Dumarea Demon Brown (1), Corry Darnell Carrigan (2), Robert Leon Johnson, III (3), Robert Leon Johnson, Jr (4). (jb) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Elijah Lyman
Monday, October 21, 2024
Case unsealed as to Dumarea Demon Brown, Corry Darnell Carrigan, Robert Leon Johnson, III, Robert Leon Johnson, Jr (cjs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Dumarea Demon Brown (cjs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Robert Leon Johnson, III (cjs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Robert Leon Johnson, Jr (cjs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Corry Darnell Carrigan (cjs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/21/2024 as to Corry Darnell Carrigan. (cjs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/21/2024 as to Robert Leon Johnson, III. (cjs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
8 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/21/2024 as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr. (cjs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/21/2024 as to Dumarea Demon Brown. (cjs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Dumarea Demon Brown: Initial Appearance set for 10/22/2024 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (mf) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr: Initial Appearance set for 10/22/2024 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (mf) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Corry Darnell Carrigan: Initial Appearance set for 10/22/2024 at 09:30 AM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter(mf) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Robert Leon Johnson, III: Initial Appearance set for 10/22/2024 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (mf) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr: Initial Appearance REset for 10/22/2024 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Change as to time only) (mf) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Corry Darnell Carrigan: Initial Appearance REset for 10/22/2024 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Change as to time only) (mf) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Initial Appearance as to Dumarea Demon Brown held on 10/22/2024, Added attorney Max A. Rudy for Dumarea Demon Brown. (DR #241022-000 Brown, Dumarea) (mf) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Dumarea Demon Brown by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
18 18 RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Dumarea Demon Brown by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Hearing as to Dumarea Demon Brown by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Detention Hearing set for 10/28/2024 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
20 20 (Text Only) ORDER as to Dumarea Demon Brown: Preliminary Hearing set for 11/4/2024 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
21 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Max A. Rudy appearing for Dumarea Demon Brown (Rudy, Max) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
22 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Initial Appearance as to Robert Leon Johnson, III held on 10/22/2024, Added attorney Alexis Madlom for Robert Leon Johnson, III. (DR #241022-000 Johnson, III, Richard) (cs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
23 23 Order appointing CJA counsel as to Robert Leon Johnson, III: Appointment of Attorney Alexis Madlom for Robert Leon Johnson, III by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
24 24 RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Robert Leon Johnson, III by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Hearing as to Robert Leon Johnson, III by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Detention Hearing set for 10/28/2024 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
26 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Initial Appearance as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr held on 10/22/2024, Added attorney Trent Neil Barkus for Robert Leon Johnson, Jr. (DR #241022-000 Johnson, Jr., Robert) (cs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
27 27 Order appointing CJA counsel as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr: Appointment of Attorney Trent Neil Barkus for Robert Leon Johnson, Jr by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
28 28 RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
29 29 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Hearing as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Detention Hearing set for 10/28/2024 at 2:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
30 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Initial Appearance as to Corry Darnell Carrigan held on 10/22/2024, Added attorney Katie L Winbauer for Corry Darnell Carrigan. (DR #241022-000 Carrigan, Corry) (cs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
31 31 (Text Only) ORDER as to Robert Leon Johnson, III: Preliminary Hearing set for 11/1/2024 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
32 32 Order appointing CJA counsel as to Corry Darnell Carrigan: Appointment of Attorney Katie L Winbauer for Corry Darnell Carrigan by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
33 33 RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Corry Darnell Carrigan by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
34 34 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Hearing as to Corry Darnell Carrigan by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Detention Hearing set for 10/29/2024 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
35 35 (Text Only) ORDER as to Corry Darnell Carrigan: Preliminary Hearing set for 11/1/2024 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
36 36 Request pursuant to Rule 404(b) as to Dumarea Demon Brown, Request for Notice pursuant to Rule 609(b) as to Dumarea Demon Brown, Request for Notice pursuant to Rule 807(b) as to Dumarea Demon Brown (Rudy, Max) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
37 37 (Text Only) ORDER as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr.: Preliminary Hearing set for 10/31/2024 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
38 38 (Text Only) ORDER as to Dumarea Demon Brown Preliminary Hearing REset for 11/4/2024 at 2:00 PM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Change in location only). (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
39 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Trent Neil Barkus appearing for Robert Leon Johnson, Jr (Barkus, Trent) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
40 40 Request pursuant to Rule 404(b) as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr (Barkus, Trent) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
41 41 Request for Notice pursuant to Rule 609(b) as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr (Barkus, Trent) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
42 42 Request for Notice pursuant to Rule 807(b) as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr (Barkus, Trent) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
43 43 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Dumarea Demon Brown (Rudy, Max) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
44 44 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial as to Dumarea Demon Brown. Detention Hearing set for 10/28/2024 is CANCELLED. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (GW) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
47 47 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Andrew J. Schultz appearing for Corry Darnell Carrigan (Schultz, Andrew) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
48 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Detention Hearing as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr waived on 10/28/2024 (DR #241028-000 Johnson, Jr., Robert) (cs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
49 49 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial as to Robert Leon Johnson, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
50 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Detention Hearing as to Robert Leon Johnson, III held on 10/28/2024 (DR #241028-000 Johnson, III, Robert) (cs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
51 51 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial as to Robert Leon Johnson, III by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
52 52 ORDER re47 Notice of Attorney Substitution as to Corry Darnell Carrigan. Attorney Andrew J. Schultz is substituted as counsel of record for Corry Darnell Carrigan. Attorney Katie L Winbauer is authorized to withdraw. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 52 replaced on 10/29/2024 to correct case number) NEF Regenerated (mf) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
54 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Detention Hearing as to Corry Darnell Carrigan held on 10/29/2024 (DR #241029-000 Carrigan, Corry) (cs) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
55 55 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial as to Corry Darnell Carrigan by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) [1:24-mj-00655-CRH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
Case unsealed as to Dumarea Demon Brown, Corry Darnell Carrigan, Robert Leon Johnson, III, Robert Leon Johnson, Jr (mf)
Related: [-]