Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-02828
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 2:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Luis Cano-Morales (1)
Represented By
Dalila Padilla Paxton
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Holly Diane Pavlinski
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jan 02 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccr)
GPO Jan 27 2025
ORDER accepting re 20 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Ernest Gonzalez. (ccr)

Docket last updated: 11/02/2024 4:26 AM CDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
Arrest of Jose Luis Cano-Morales (drda) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales. (drda) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales. (drda) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales. (drda) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales. (drda) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales held on 10/7/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 10/10/2024 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Dalila Padilla Paxton for Jose Luis Cano-Morales. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ccl) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Jose Luis Cano-Morales (Paxton, Dalila) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE Assertion of Rights by Jose Luis Cano-Morales (Paxton, Dalila) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (r013) [2:24-mj-02836-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
8 8 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
10 10 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Jose Luis Cano-Morales (bot1)
Related: [-]