California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-02263
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 12:30 AM PDT
Defendant
David Quiroz (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Samuel J. Pope
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Material Witness
Raymundo Castillo-Ruiz
Represented By
Christopher K. Monelt
Law Firm Of Christopher K. Monelt
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
David J. Kete
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/02/2024 1:49 AM PDT
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT (t/w NTA) as to David Quiroz (1).(fjp) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Defendant David Quiroz. (fjp) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to David Quiroz: Initial Appearance set for 10/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Christopher K. Monelt appointed for Raymundo Castillo-Ruiz. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to David Quiroz: Initial Appearance set for 10/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David J. Kete appearing for USA. (Kete, David)Attorney David J. Kete added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi). [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Fingerprint and release David Quiroz. Bond paperwork due by close of business 10/4/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 10/2/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM read receipt
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Initial Appearance as to David Quiroz held on 10/2/2024. Oral proffer confirmed. Appointed Federal Defenders for David Quiroz. Bond set as to David Quiroz (1) $10,000 PS secured by 2 FRRA and 10% cash deposit. Abstract issued. Defendant to fingerprint and release. Defendant to contact PTS 10/3/24. Bond paperwork due 10/4/24. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 10/15/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Arraignment set for 10/31/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. ) (CD# 10/2/2024 SBC 24-1:4:26-4:37). (Plaintiff Attorney Kristen Mihelic AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jordan Schaer, Kyra Sinclair FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
9 9 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to David Quiroz (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for David Quiroz (1) $10,000 P/S secured by 2 FRRA, 10% cash deposit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 10/2/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to David Quiroz: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 10/2/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
7 7 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to David Quiroz: Arraignment of MW - Raymundo Castillo-Ruiz set for 10/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Samuel J. Pope appearing for David Quiroz (Pope, Samuel)Attorney Samuel J. Pope added to party David Quiroz(pty:dft) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to David Quiroz. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/31/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 10/3/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Raymundo Castillo-Ruiz. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 10/3/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Arraignment of Material Witness Raymundo Castillo-Ruiz held on 10/3/2024. Material Witness bail set at $5,000 PS w/10% percent cash deposit. (CD# 10/3/2024 SBC 24-1:2:03-2:07). (Plaintiff Attorney Kristen Mihelic AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
16 16 Material Witness Bond filed - $5,000 P/S w/10 percent cash deposit, Receipt # 156560 as to MW Raymundo Castillo-Ruiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 10/9/2024; abstract issued to USM. (Document applicable to USA, Raymundo Castillo-Ruiz.) (dls) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
17 17 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Material Witness Raymundo Castillo-Ruiz, re16 Material Witness Bond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 10/9/2024. (dls) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM read receipt
Friday, October 11, 2024
18 18 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to David Quiroz. Report prepared by: C. Ramirez. (Document applicable to USA, David Quiroz.) (Ramirez, C.) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
19 19 P/S Bond Filed as to David Quiroz in amount of $10,000, Receipt # 156624. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 10/11/2024. (Document applicable to USA, David Quiroz.) (dls) [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
20 20 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Kete, David) (axi). [3:24-mj-03733-SBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
21 21 INFORMATION as to David Quiroz (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bas1)
Related: [-]
22 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Arraignment on Information as to David Quiroz (1) Count 1,2 held on 10/31/2024. Defendant present on bond; Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 12/20/2024 09:00 AM before District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (Interpreter Alejandro Rodriguez). (CD# 10/31/2024 SBC 133-144). (Plaintiff Attorney David Kete, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney Sam Pope, FD). (Material Witness Attorney Christopher Monelt, CJA). (dls)
Related: [-]
23 23 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to David Quiroz (no document attached) (dls)
Related: [-]