Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12534

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:24-bk-12533
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC
308 Willow Ave
Hoboken, NJ 07030-3808
Represented By
Peter C. Hughes
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
9 9 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Wed 01/22 9:04 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
8 8 misc Exhibit Fri 01/03 3:25 PM
Exhibit(s) Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methodology, Disclosures and Disclaimers Regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs Related [+] Filed by Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-] 6 ,7
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 12/23 10:07 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 12/23 10:06 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC. (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 11/19 10:07 AM
AMENDED ORDER (I) DIRECTING JOINT ADMINISTRATION OF CHAPTER 11 CASES AND (II) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF"An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: CarePoint Health Systems Inc. d/b/a Just Health Foundation, Case No. 24-12534 HUMC Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Hoboken University Medical Center, Case No. 24-12548 IJKG Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Bayonne Medical Center, Case No. 24-12551 Hudson Hospital Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Christ Hospital, Case No. 24-12546 Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12541 Hudson Hospital Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12545 CH Hudson Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12540 Hoboken Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12544 Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12533 Sequoia BMC Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12554 IJKG, LLC, Case No. 24-12549 CarePoint Health Management Associates, LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health, Case No. 24-12538 Quality Care Associates, LLC, Case No. 24-12553 HUMC Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12547 CarePoint Health Management Associates Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12537 Briar Hill CarePoint LLC, Case No. 24-12536 Evergreen Community Assets, Case No. 24-12542 Benego CarePoint LLC, Case No. 24-12535 Garden State Healthcare Associates, LLC, Case No. 24-12543 Just Health MSO, LLC, Case No. 24-12550 and New Jersey Medical and Health Associates, LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health Medical Group, Case No. 24-12552 The docket in Case No. 24-12534 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case." Signed on 11/19/2024 (AJL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Thu 11/07 7:45 AM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. Signed on 11/6/2024 (LAM)Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases And Granting Related Relief "An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: CarePoint Health Systems Inc. d/b/a Just Health Foundation, Case No. 24-12534 HUMC Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Hoboken University Medical Center, Case No. 24-12548 IJKG Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Bayonne Medical Center, Case No. 24-12551 Hudson Hospital Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Christ Hospital, Case No. 24-12546 Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12541 Hudson Hospital Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12545 CH Hudson Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12540 Hoboken Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12544 Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12533 Sequoia BMC Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12554 IJKG, LLC, Case No. 24-12549 CarePoint Health Management Associates, LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health, Case No. 24-12538 Quality Care Associates, LLC, Case No. 24-12553 HUMC Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12547 CarePoint Health Management Associates Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12537 Briar Hill CarePoint LLC, Case No. 24-12536 Evergreen Community Assets, Case No. 24-12542 and Benego CarePoint LLC, Case No. 24-12535 The docket in Case No. 24-12534 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case." Related [+] Order Signed on 11/6/2024. (AJL)
Related: [-] 4
Sunday, November 03, 2024
3 3 13 pgs motion Joint Administration - Motion Sun 11/03 11:11 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed By Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC(Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order re Joint Administration
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 11/03 10:22 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12533 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11871828, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 11/03 7:12 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 12/3/2024 (Hughes, Peter)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Sun 11/03 9:14 PM
Judge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH)
Related: [-]