Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12534
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12534
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | J Kate Stickles |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-12541 |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC
308 Willow Ave
Hoboken, NJ 07030-3808 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() AMENDED ORDER (I) DIRECTING JOINT ADMINISTRATION OF CHAPTER 11 CASES AND (II) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF"An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: CarePoint Health Systems Inc. d/b/a Just Health Foundation, Case No. 24-12534 HUMC Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Hoboken University Medical Center, Case No. 24-12548 IJKG Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Bayonne Medical Center, Case No. 24-12551 Hudson Hospital Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Christ Hospital, Case No. 24-12546 Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12541 Hudson Hospital Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12545 CH Hudson Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12540 Hoboken Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12544 Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12533 Sequoia BMC Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12554 IJKG, LLC, Case No. 24-12549 CarePoint Health Management Associates, LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health, Case No. 24-12538 Quality Care Associates, LLC, Case No. 24-12553 HUMC Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12547 CarePoint Health Management Associates Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12537 Briar Hill CarePoint LLC, Case No. 24-12536 Evergreen Community Assets, Case No. 24-12542 Benego CarePoint LLC, Case No. 24-12535 Garden State Healthcare Associates, LLC, Case No. 24-12543 Just Health MSO, LLC, Case No. 24-12550 and New Jersey Medical and Health Associates, LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health Medical Group, Case No. 24-12552 The docket in Case No. 24-12534 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case." Signed on 11/19/2024 (AJL) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Authorizing Joint Administration. Signed on 11/6/2024 (LAM)Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases And Granting Related Relief "An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: CarePoint Health Systems Inc. d/b/a Just Health Foundation, Case No. 24-12534 HUMC Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Hoboken University Medical Center, Case No. 24-12548 IJKG Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Bayonne Medical Center, Case No. 24-12551 Hudson Hospital Opco LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health-Christ Hospital, Case No. 24-12546 Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12541 Hudson Hospital Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12545 CH Hudson Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12540 Hoboken Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12544 Bayonne Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12533 Sequoia BMC Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12554 IJKG, LLC, Case No. 24-12549 CarePoint Health Management Associates, LLC d/b/a CarePoint Health, Case No. 24-12538 Quality Care Associates, LLC, Case No. 24-12553 HUMC Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12547 CarePoint Health Management Associates Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Case No. 24-12537 Briar Hill CarePoint LLC, Case No. 24-12536 Evergreen Community Assets, Case No. 24-12542 and Benego CarePoint LLC, Case No. 24-12535 The docket in Case No. 24-12534 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case." Order Signed on 11/6/2024. (AJL) |
|
Sunday, November 03, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed By Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC(Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Sun 11/03 10:23 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12541 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11871828, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Christ Intermediate Holdco, LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Sun 11/03 9:22 PM
Judge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH) |